EP3181707 - METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF LEATHER OR FUR SEMI-FINISHED PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH Kennedyplatz 1 50569 Köln / DE | [2017/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bley, Matthias Wahnenkamp 24 42697 Solingen / DE | 02 /
Konrad, Michael Im Steinfeld 33a 51371 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
Tysoe, Chris Eidechsenweg 47 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
Reiners, Jürgen Carl- Rumpff-Strasse 57 51375 Leverkusen / DE | [2017/25] | Application number, filing date | 15201342.1 | 18.12.2015 | [2017/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3181707 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C14C3/20, C08G8/20 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
C14C3/20 (EP);
C08G8/18 (EP);
C08G8/20 (EP);
C08G8/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LEDER- ODER PELZ-HALBFABRIKATEN | [2017/25] | English: | METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF LEATHER OR FUR SEMI-FINISHED PRODUCTS | [2017/25] | French: | PROCEDE DESTINE A LA FABRICATION DE SEMI-PRODUITS EN CUIR OU EN FOURRURE | [2017/25] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/25] | 29.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE2934980 (BAYER AG) [X] 11,15 * page 3, line 1 - page 8, line 7 * * page 10, lines 12-13 * * examples 1-4 * * claims 1,6 * [A] 1-10,12-14; | [XA]EP0268374 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 11 * example 6 * [A] 1-10,12-15; | [A]WO0000691 (PEACH STATE LABS INC [US]) [A] 1-10,12-15 * page 5, lines 2-20 ** example 1 *; | [XA]EP1096058 (NICCA CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0007] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0015] - [0018] * [A] 1-10,12-15; | [XA]DE10140551 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 11,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] - [0027] * * examples 1-5 * * claims 1,7-11 * [A] 1-10,12-14 | by applicant | DE848823 | DE1113457 | EP0459168 | EP1416058 | EP1647563 | WO2010130311 | WO2012136565 | - Ullmanns Enzyklopädie der technischen Chemie, (1978), vol. 16, pages 138 - 140 | - W. SIEFKEN, LIEBIGS ANNALEN DER CHEMIE, vol. 562, pages 75 - 136 | - Ullmanns Encyklopädie der technischen Chemie, (1979), vol. 16, page 138 |