EP3042564 - PROCESSING LINE AND METHOD FOR INSPECTING A POULTRY CARCASS AND/OR A VISCERA PACKAGE TAKEN OUT FROM THE POULTRY CARCASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2020 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meyn Food Processing Technology B.V. Westeinde 6 1511 MA Oostzaan / NL | [2016/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Steijn, Aloysius Christianus Maria c/o Westeinde 6 1511 MA Oostzaan / NL | 02 /
Van Stralen, Rick Sebastiaan c/o Westeinde 6 1511 MA Oostzaan / NL | 03 /
Ten Hoeve, Nils c/o Westeinde 6 1511 MA Oostzaan / NL | [2016/28] | Representative(s) | van Breda, Jacobus Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V. P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/47] | Van Breda, Jacobus Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V. Weteringschans 96 1017 XS Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2016/28] | Van Breda, Jacobus Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V., Weteringschans 96 1017 XS Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 15201618.4 | 21.12.2015 | [2016/28] | Priority number, date | NL20142014037 | 22.12.2014 Original published format: NL 2014037 | [2016/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3042564 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3042564 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3042564 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A22C21/06, A22C21/00, A22C17/00 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
A22C17/0073 (EP,US);
A22C21/06 (EP,BR,RU,US);
A22C21/00 (BR,RU);
A22C21/0053 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/28] | A22C21/06, A22C21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] |
Former [2016/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERARBEITUNGSLINIE UND VERFAHREN ZUR INSPEKTION EINES GEFLÜGELKADAVERS UND/ODER EINES AUS DEM GEFLÜGELKADAVER HERAUSGENOMMEN EINGEWEIDEPAKETS | [2016/28] | English: | PROCESSING LINE AND METHOD FOR INSPECTING A POULTRY CARCASS AND/OR A VISCERA PACKAGE TAKEN OUT FROM THE POULTRY CARCASS | [2016/28] | French: | LIGNE DE TRAITEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ D'INSPECTION D'UNE CARCASSE DE VOLAILLE ET/OU D'UN ENSEMBLE DE VISCÈRES PRÉLEVÉ DE LA CARCASSE DE VOLAILLE | [2016/28] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 13.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.08.2018
ADMISSIBLE Marel Stork Poultry Processing B.V. Handelstraat 3 5831 AV Boxmeer / NL Opponent's representative Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [2018/39] | 05.09.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.11.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 31.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.12.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.12.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.03.2020 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 15.07.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 03.02.2020 | Appeal received No. T0440/20 | 06.03.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2015 | AL | 22.11.2017 | AT | 22.11.2017 | CY | 22.11.2017 | CZ | 22.11.2017 | EE | 22.11.2017 | ES | 22.11.2017 | FI | 22.11.2017 | HR | 22.11.2017 | IT | 22.11.2017 | LT | 22.11.2017 | LV | 22.11.2017 | MC | 22.11.2017 | MK | 22.11.2017 | PL | 22.11.2017 | PT | 22.11.2017 | RO | 22.11.2017 | RS | 22.11.2017 | SE | 22.11.2017 | SI | 22.11.2017 | SK | 22.11.2017 | SM | 22.11.2017 | TR | 22.11.2017 | IE | 21.12.2017 | LU | 21.12.2017 | MT | 21.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | BG | 22.02.2018 | NO | 22.02.2018 | GR | 23.02.2018 | IS | 22.03.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 21.12.2015 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
MK | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 21.12.2015 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
MK | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | HU | 21.12.2015 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
MK | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 21.12.2015 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
MK | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.12.2015 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 22.11.2017 | |
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4616381 (HARRIS JR CLARENCE E [US]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * column 1, line 8 - column 5, line 65 *; | [A]EP0819381 (STORK PMT [NL]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * column 6, lines 8-48 ** column 8, line 45 - column 9, line 20 *; | [A]US6227960 (MARTIN EUGENE G [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * column 31, line 22 - column 32, line 17 *; | [AD]WO0176378 (LINDHOLST & CO AS [DK], et al) [AD] 1-22 * abstract * * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 32 *; | [AD]EP1222858 (STORK PMT [NL]) [AD] 1-22 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0077] * | by applicant | WO0176378 | EP1222858 | - DAVID AMEY, "Hands-off Inspection Proving Processors' Utopia", JOURNAL PPM (POULTRY PROCESSING AND MARKETING, (197801), pages 28 - 33 | Opposition | US4627007 | GB2219268 | WO0040094 | EP1222858 | US2009271004 | WO2011036618 | US2011080339 | US2011183751 | US2012070070 | US2012078614 | EP2442196 | US8292833 | WO2013109525 | US2014055352 | DE102013200457 | - "Qualitat erzeugt man mit qualitat", Poultry Processing international, (19890600), pages 1 - 10, XP055515101 |