EP3064109 - A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A MIXER, A CONTROLLER AND A MIXER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Foshan City Shunde Jutian Electric Appliance Co., Ltd. No.3, Xinyou Road Ronggui Town Shunde District Foshan Guangdong 528305 / CN | [2016/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Le, Meiyi NO.3, Xinyou Road, Ronggui Town, Shunde District 528305 Foshan / CN | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Wetterkreuz 3 91058 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/36] | Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Marie-Curie-Str. 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | Application number, filing date | 15201671.3 | 21.12.2015 | [2016/36] | Priority number, date | CN20151097885 | 05.03.2015 Original published format: CN201510097885 | CN201520127769U | 05.03.2015 Original published format: CN 201520127769 U | CN201520476513U | 02.07.2015 Original published format: CN 201520476513 U | CN201510916053 | 11.12.2015 Original published format: CN201510916053 | [2016/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3064109 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3064109 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A47J43/07, A47J43/08 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
A47J43/085 (EP,US);
A47J43/046 (US);
A47J43/0716 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES MISCHERS, STEUERUNG UND MISCHER | [2016/36] | English: | A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A MIXER, A CONTROLLER AND A MIXER | [2016/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR COMMANDER UN MÉLANGEUR, CONTRÔLEUR ET MÉLANGEUR | [2016/36] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 28.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2015 | AL | 21.06.2017 | AT | 21.06.2017 | CY | 21.06.2017 | CZ | 21.06.2017 | DK | 21.06.2017 | EE | 21.06.2017 | ES | 21.06.2017 | FI | 21.06.2017 | HR | 21.06.2017 | LT | 21.06.2017 | LV | 21.06.2017 | MC | 21.06.2017 | MK | 21.06.2017 | NL | 21.06.2017 | PL | 21.06.2017 | PT | 21.06.2017 | RO | 21.06.2017 | RS | 21.06.2017 | SE | 21.06.2017 | SI | 21.06.2017 | SK | 21.06.2017 | SM | 21.06.2017 | TR | 21.06.2017 | BG | 21.09.2017 | NO | 21.09.2017 | GR | 22.09.2017 | IS | 21.10.2017 | IE | 21.12.2017 | LU | 21.12.2017 | MT | 21.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 21.12.2015 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MK | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PT | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
TR | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 21.12.2015 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MK | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
TR | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 21.12.2015 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MK | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 21.12.2015 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.12.2015 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 21.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 21.12.2017 | ||
MT | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 21.06.2017 | |
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006007778 (TAI CHUN-YU [TW]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0010] , [0022] , [0023]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2006123996 (PAVLOVIC HENRIK [SI], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0011]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2008098905 (STEINER MARK C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0025] , [0032]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0963726 (HISPAINOX S A [ES]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0028]; figure -; claim - * |