EP3026972 - RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, BASE STATION APPARATUS, TERMINAL APPARATUS, AND RADIO COMMUNICATION METHOD IN RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2016/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ODE, Takayoshi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Takaharu c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2016/22] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Bürkleinstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/22] | Reichl, Philipp Haseltine Lake LLP 5th Floor Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 15201703.4 | 15.06.2009 | [2016/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3026972 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/024, H04W72/04, H04L25/03, H04W16/28, H04J11/00, H04L5/00, // H04W72/08, H04W72/12 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
H04B7/024 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W72/0466 (KR,US);
H04J11/0053 (EP,CN,US);
H04L25/03866 (US);
H04L5/0035 (US);
H04W72/542 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W72/27 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/22] | H04W72/04, H04L25/03, H04W16/28, H04J11/00, H04L5/00, H04B7/02, // H04W72/08, H04W72/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/02] |
Former [2016/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG, ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN IN EINEM FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2016/22] | English: | RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, BASE STATION APPARATUS, TERMINAL APPARATUS, AND RADIO COMMUNICATION METHOD IN RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2016/22] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION RADIO, APPAREIL DE STATION DE BASE, APPAREIL DE TERMINAL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION RADIO DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION RADIO | [2016/22] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 21.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/13] | 12.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09846113.0 / EP2445286 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 07.12.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 07.12.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.12.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1983792 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022] ** paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] *; | [Y] - QUALCOMM EUROPE, "Further Considerations and Link Simulations on Reference Signals in LTE-A", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-090875, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090204), no. Athens, Greece; 20090204, XP050318724 [Y] 1-12 * Section 1, last sentence; page 1 * | by applicant | JP2006311475 | JP2008092379 |