EP3096050 - BLOCKING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VAG-Armaturen GmbH Carl-Reuther-Strasse 1 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2016/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauner, Ivo Mokré rádjy 265 69602 Ratiskovice / CZ | [2016/47] | Representative(s) | Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstraße 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/47] | Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Fuggerstrasse 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 15201825.5 | 22.12.2015 | [2016/47] | Priority number, date | DE201510107840 | 19.05.2015 Original published format: DE102015107840 | [2016/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3096050 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3096050 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16K3/30, F16K3/314, F16K25/00 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
F16K3/314 (EP,CN);
F16K3/12 (CN);
F16K25/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] |
Former [2016/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ABSPERRELEMENT | [2016/47] | English: | BLOCKING ELEMENT | [2016/47] | French: | ÉLEMENT DE BLOCAGE | [2016/47] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 17.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2015 | AL | 21.02.2018 | CY | 21.02.2018 | CZ | 21.02.2018 | DK | 21.02.2018 | EE | 21.02.2018 | ES | 21.02.2018 | FI | 21.02.2018 | HR | 21.02.2018 | IT | 21.02.2018 | LT | 21.02.2018 | LV | 21.02.2018 | MC | 21.02.2018 | MK | 21.02.2018 | MT | 21.02.2018 | NL | 21.02.2018 | PL | 21.02.2018 | PT | 21.02.2018 | RO | 21.02.2018 | RS | 21.02.2018 | SE | 21.02.2018 | SI | 21.02.2018 | SK | 21.02.2018 | SM | 21.02.2018 | TR | 21.02.2018 | BG | 21.05.2018 | NO | 21.05.2018 | GR | 22.05.2018 | IS | 21.06.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 22.12.2015 | |
AL | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
MK | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PT | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PT | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2013144276 (E HAWLE ARMATURENWERKE GMBH [AT]) [AD] 1-10 * page 8, paragraph 8 - page 10, paragraph 3; figures 1-5 * * page 13 - page 13 * * page 2, paragraph 1 - page 2, paragraph 5 *; | [A]US5074526 (RAGSDALE WAYMON [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 4, column 7, line 61 - page 5, column 8, line 51; figures 6-8 *; | [A]AT509083 (E HAWLE ARMATURENWERKE GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-10 * page 10 - page 10; figures 2-3 * * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 3; claims 1-21 *; | [A]WO2013010546 (AVK HOLDING AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 9, line 28 - page 12, line 10; figure - *; | [A]DE1203071 (JOHANNES ERHARD, et al) [A] 1-10 * page 1, column 1, line 8 - page 1, column 1, line 36; figure 1; claim 1 * * page 1, column 2, line 36 - page 1, column 2, line 39 * | by applicant | WO2013144276 |