EP3038064 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR HAPTICALLY-ENABLED ALARMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immersion Corporation 50 Rio Robles San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2016/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMAM, Abdelwahab 30 Rue Prince-Arthur O, Apt. 530 Montreal, Québec H2X 3R5 / CA | 02 /
MOUSAKHANIAN, Razmik 29 Saint-Tropez Kirkland, Québec H9J 2K7 / CA | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Phillips & Leigh LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/26] | Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15202958.3 | 29.12.2015 | [2016/26] | Priority number, date | US201414582503 | 24.12.2014 Original published format: US201414582503 | [2016/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3038064 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G08B6/00, G06F3/01 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
G08B6/00 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/016 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/03545 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] |
Former [2016/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR HAPTISCH AKTIVIERTE ALARME | [2016/26] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR HAPTICALLY-ENABLED ALARMS | [2016/26] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR ALARMES ACTIVÉES DE MANIÈRE HAPTIQUE | [2016/26] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/03] | 16.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/48] | 21.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1505550 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,9,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0066]; figure 2 *; | [X]US2012062371 (RADIVOJEVIC ZORAN [GB], et al) [X] 1-6,9,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0048] * * figures 2a,2b,2c,5 *; | [I]US2013307786 (HEUBEL ROBERT [US]) [I] 1,3,6-10 * abstract ** paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0047]; figures 2,3 *; | [XA]EP2763000 (IMMERSION CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1,3,4 * [A] 3; | [XI]US2014266692 (FREEDMAN SETH [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6,9,10 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042] * * figures 1A,1B,1C,2,3 * [I] 2 |