EP3028680 - DELIVERY DEVICE HANDLE ASSEMBLY FOR THE SEQUENTIAL DEPLOYMENT OF A PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cook Medical Technologies LLC 750 North Daniels Way Bloomington, IN 47404 / US | [2016/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKELTON, Eugene 1 Clonmore Road North Strand Dublin, D3 / IE | 02 /
WRIGHT, Anthony 10 Castlewood Place Rathmines Dublin, D6 / IE | 03 /
ROEDER, Blayne A. 4668 South Livia Drive Bloomington, IN 47401 / US | 04 /
MACATANGAY, Edwin E. 1613 South Renwick Boulevard Bloomington, IN 47401 / US | 05 /
DEBRUYNE, Michael P. 300 North Sheffield Drive Bloomington, IN 47408 / US | 06 /
VAD, Siddharth 10202 Dana Irvine, CA 92618 / US | 07 /
JONES, Natalie 6000 Windham Dr. Raleigh, NC 27609 / US | 08 /
NEOH, Wen Hong 3000 South Walnut Street Pike, Apt. 16 Bloomington, IN 47401 / US | 09 /
HUGHES, Erik 424 Greyfox Court Greenwood, IN 46142 / US | [2016/23] | Representative(s) | Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/23] | Williams Powell 11 Staple Inn London WC1V 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 15275220.0 | 22.10.2015 | [2016/23] | Priority number, date | US201462087457P | 04.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462087457 P | [2016/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3028680 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3028680 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/95, A61F2/966, A61F2/962 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
A61F2/9517 (EP,US);
A61F2/9662 (EP,US);
A61F2/07 (EP,US);
A61F2/82 (EP,US);
A61F2002/9534 (EP,US);
A61F2002/9665 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] |
Former [2016/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GRIFFANORDNUNG EINER AUSGABEVORRICHTUNG ZUM SEQUENTIELLEN EINSETZEN EINER PROTHESE | [2016/23] | English: | DELIVERY DEVICE HANDLE ASSEMBLY FOR THE SEQUENTIAL DEPLOYMENT OF A PROSTHESIS | [2016/23] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE POIGNÉE DE DISPOSITIF DE LIVRAISON POUR LE DÉPLOIEMENT SÉQUENTIEL D'UNE PROTHÈSE | [2016/23] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 20.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17192738.7 / EP3284446 | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.10.2015 | AL | 29.11.2017 | AT | 29.11.2017 | CY | 29.11.2017 | CZ | 29.11.2017 | DK | 29.11.2017 | EE | 29.11.2017 | ES | 29.11.2017 | FI | 29.11.2017 | HR | 29.11.2017 | IT | 29.11.2017 | LT | 29.11.2017 | LV | 29.11.2017 | MC | 29.11.2017 | MK | 29.11.2017 | NL | 29.11.2017 | PL | 29.11.2017 | PT | 29.11.2017 | RO | 29.11.2017 | RS | 29.11.2017 | SE | 29.11.2017 | SI | 29.11.2017 | SK | 29.11.2017 | SM | 29.11.2017 | TR | 29.11.2017 | BG | 28.02.2018 | NO | 28.02.2018 | GR | 01.03.2018 | IS | 29.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/32] | HU | 22.10.2015 | |
AT | 29.11.2017 | ||
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MK | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
IS | 29.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/31] | HU | 22.10.2015 | |
AT | 29.11.2017 | ||
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MK | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 29.11.2017 | |
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5776142 (GUNDERSON RICHARD C [US]) [X] 1-5,8,9 * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 6 * * column 6, line 1 - line 8 * * column 7, line 39 - line 47 * * figures 1, 4, 7, 8 * [I] 10-13; | [I]WO2011126690 (MEDTRONIC VASULAR INC [US], et al) [I] 1,6,7 * paragraphs [0035] , [0 36] , [0 38] , [0 44]; figures 4, 5, 6, 7, 16A *; | [A]EP2522315 (COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0028] - [0030] - [0 32] , [0 33] , [0 36] , [0 38] , [0 48]; figures 1, 2, 3, 8, 9 *; | [A]US2013338787 (HOPKINS TONY C [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0061] , [0 62] , [0 63] , [0 67]; figures 1,4, 5 * |