EP3065502 - ACCESS NODE DEVICE FOR MANAGING UPSTREAM NETWORK TRAFFIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2016/36] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Olaziregi, Nikolas Alcatel-Lucent Bell N.V. Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | 02 /
Kozicki, Bartlomiej Alcatel-Lucent Bell N.V. Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | 03 /
Tang, Siyu Alcatel-Lucent Bell N.V. Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | 04 /
Borghs, Eric Frans Elisa Alcatel-Lucent Bell N.V. Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2016/36] | Plas, Axel Ivo Michel IP HILLS NV Hubert Frère-Orbanlaan 329 9000 Gent / BE | Application number, filing date | 15290055.1 | 03.03.2015 | [2016/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3065502 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/10, H04L12/911 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
H04L47/83 (EP);
H04W88/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/36] | H04W88/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] |
Former [2016/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUGANGSKNOTENVORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWALTUNG VON STROMAUFWÄRTIGEM NETZWERKVERKEHR | [2016/36] | English: | ACCESS NODE DEVICE FOR MANAGING UPSTREAM NETWORK TRAFFIC | [2016/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF À NOEUD D'ACCÈS POUR LA GESTION D'UN TRAFIC DE RÉSEAU EN AMONT | [2016/36] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/15] | 28.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 15.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1355452 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0018] * * claims 1-10 *; | [A]US2004085909 (SOLIMAN SAMIR S [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0057] ** claims 1-23 *; | [X]EP1708446 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0055] * * claims 1-10 * |