EP2921227 - FISCHER-TROPSCH CATALYST BASED ON A GROUP VIIIB METAL AND A CARRIER OF OXIDES INCLUDING ALUMINA, SILICA, A SPINEL AND PHOSPHORUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | For all designated states ENI S.p.A. Piazzale E. Mattei 1 00144 Roma / IT | [2017/44] |
Former [2015/39] | For all designated states IFP Énergies nouvelles 1 & 4, avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
For all designated states ENI S.p.A. Piazzale E. Mattei 1 00144 Roma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Decottignies, Dominique 0053 Rte de Vourles 69230 Saint-Genis-Laval / FR | 02 /
Diehl, Fabrice 0009 T Rue de Montbrillant 69003 Lyon / FR | 03 /
Lecocq, Vincent 0560 Rte du Paradis 69530 Orlienas / FR | 04 /
Velly, Marie 0013 Rte de Pelussin 42520 Maclas / FR | [2015/39] | Representative(s) | Schmitt, Nicolas A.J., et al IFP Energies nouvelles Département Propriété Industrielle Rond-point de l'Echangeur de Solaize BP3 69360 Solaize / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/15] | Ruis, Alain, et al IFP Energies nouvelles Département Propriété Industrielle 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2015/39] | Ruis, Alain, et al IFP Energies nouvelles 1 et 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 15305245.1 | 19.02.2015 | [2015/39] | Priority number, date | FR20140052311 | 20.03.2014 Original published format: FR 1452311 | [2015/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2921227 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2921227 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/75, C10G2/00 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
B01J27/1853 (EP,US);
B01J21/12 (EP,US);
B01J23/005 (EP,US);
B01J23/75 (EP,US);
B01J23/755 (EP,US);
B01J35/613 (EP,US);
B01J35/615 (EP,US);
B01J35/633 (EP,US);
B01J35/635 (EP,US);
B01J37/0201 (EP,US);
B01J37/0205 (EP,US);
B01J37/0209 (EP,US);
B01J37/08 (US);
B01J37/088 (EP,US);
B01J37/28 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] |
Former [2015/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FISCHER-TROPSCH-KATALYSATOR AUF DER BASIS EINES METALLS DER GRUPPE VIIIB UND EINES TRÄGERS AUS OXIDEN, DER ALUMINIUMOXID, SILIZIUMDIOXID, EIN SPINELL UND PHOSPHOR UMFASST | [2015/39] | English: | FISCHER-TROPSCH CATALYST BASED ON A GROUP VIIIB METAL AND A CARRIER OF OXIDES INCLUDING ALUMINA, SILICA, A SPINEL AND PHOSPHORUS | [2015/39] | French: | CATALYSEUR FISCHER-TROPSCH À BASE D'UN METAL DU GROUPE VIIIB ET D'UN SUPPORT D'OXYDES COMPRENANT DE L'ALUMINE, DE LA SILICE, UNE SPINELLE ET DU PHOSPHORE | [2016/52] |
Former [2015/39] | Catalyseur Fischer-Tropsch à base d'un metal du groupe VIIIB et d'un support d'oxydes comprenant de l'alumine, de la silice, une spinelle et du phosphore | Examination procedure | 12.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 17.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.02.2015 | AL | 12.04.2017 | AT | 12.04.2017 | CY | 12.04.2017 | CZ | 12.04.2017 | EE | 12.04.2017 | ES | 12.04.2017 | FI | 12.04.2017 | HR | 12.04.2017 | LT | 12.04.2017 | LV | 12.04.2017 | MC | 12.04.2017 | MK | 12.04.2017 | MT | 12.04.2017 | PL | 12.04.2017 | PT | 12.04.2017 | RO | 12.04.2017 | RS | 12.04.2017 | SE | 12.04.2017 | SI | 12.04.2017 | SK | 12.04.2017 | SM | 12.04.2017 | TR | 12.04.2017 | BG | 12.07.2017 | NO | 12.07.2017 | GR | 13.07.2017 | IS | 12.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 19.02.2015 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 19.02.2015 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2009119977 (KOREA RES INST CHEM TECH [KR], et al); | [X]WO2012020210 (GTL F1 AG [CH], et al); | [Y]EP2669006 (IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES [FR], et al) | by applicant | WO2005072866 | FR2879478 | WO2009014292 |