EP3067784 - A PREHENSILE NEAR FIELD COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM CONTROLLABLE BY A SHAKING GESTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEMALTO SA 6 Rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2016/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Do Thuong, Tuan GEMALTO SA, Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box Gemalto SA 6, rue de la verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | 02 /
Callon de Monet de Lamarck, Charlotte P.O. Box Gemalto SA 6, rue de la verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2016/37] | Representative(s) | Delaval, Guillaume Laurent, et al Thales Dis France SA Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/37] | Delaval, Guillaume Laurent, et al Gemalto SA Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92197 Meudon Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 15305368.1 | 11.03.2015 | [2016/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3067784 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, H04M1/725, H04W52/02, G06F1/16, G06Q20/32, G06F3/0346 | [2016/37] | CPC: |
G06F3/0346 (EP);
G06F1/1694 (EP);
G06F3/016 (EP);
G06Q20/3278 (EP);
H04M1/72412 (EP);
H04W52/0254 (EP);
H04M2250/04 (EP);
H04M2250/12 (EP);
H04M2250/14 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCH SCHÜTTELGESTE STEUERBARES, ZUM GREIFEN GEEIGNETES NAHFELDKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2016/37] | English: | A PREHENSILE NEAR FIELD COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM CONTROLLABLE BY A SHAKING GESTURE | [2016/37] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION EN CHAMP PROCHE DE PRÉHENSION COMMANDÉ PAR UN GESTE DE SECOUAGE | [2016/37] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/40] | 24.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009270045 (FLAHERTY NATASHA MARGARET MINENKO [US]) [A] 4,5 * paragraphs [0002] , [0015] , [0016] * * paragraphs [0031] , [0032]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP2485542 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0009] , [0011]; figure 1 ** paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0017]; figures 2A,2B *; | [A]US2013033418 (BEVILACQUA MATHEW WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 3 * paragraphs [0022] , [0025]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0029] - [0031] - [0035]; figure 2 *; | [IA]WO2014132212 (LOGOMOTION SRO [SK]) [I] 12 * abstract * * page 3, line 4 - line 13 * * page 5, line 9 - line 16 * * page 6, line 12 - page 7, line 9; figures 1,2,6 * [A] 1-11,13; | [XAI]GB2515550 (MASTERCARD INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [X] 1,2,6-8,13 * page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 3 * * page 11, line 10 - page 12, line 2; figures 1-3 * * page 13, line 1 - page 15, line 2; figure 2 * * page 16, line 4 - line 12 * * page 19, line 28 - page 20, line 5 * [A] 12 [I] 3-5,9-11 |