EP2923542 - Seed drill with a console having two working tools [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuhn SAS 4 impasse des Fabriques 67700 Saverne / FR | [2020/29] |
Former [2015/40] | For all designated states KUHN S.A. 4, Impasse des Fabriques 67700 Saverne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Potier, Philippe 3 Moderfeld 67290 Zittersheim / FR | 02 /
Viriat, Laurent 4 rue des Acacias 67440 Westhouse-Marmoutier / FR | [2015/40] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nuss 10, rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | [2021/18] |
Former [2015/40] | Nuss, Laurent, et al Cabinet Nuss 10, rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 15305434.1 | 25.03.2015 | [2015/40] | Priority number, date | FR20140052577 | 26.03.2014 Original published format: FR 1452577 | [2015/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2923542 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2923542 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01C5/06 | [2015/40] | CPC: |
A01C5/064 (EP);
A01C7/201 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] |
Former [2015/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Sämaschine, die eine Konsole mit zwei Werkzeugen umfasst | [2015/40] | English: | Seed drill with a console having two working tools | [2015/40] | French: | Semoir avec une console portant deux outils | [2015/40] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 04.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.03.2015 | AL | 05.05.2021 | AT | 05.05.2021 | CY | 05.05.2021 | CZ | 05.05.2021 | DK | 05.05.2021 | EE | 05.05.2021 | ES | 05.05.2021 | FI | 05.05.2021 | HR | 05.05.2021 | IT | 05.05.2021 | LT | 05.05.2021 | LV | 05.05.2021 | MC | 05.05.2021 | MK | 05.05.2021 | NL | 05.05.2021 | PL | 05.05.2021 | RO | 05.05.2021 | RS | 05.05.2021 | SE | 05.05.2021 | SI | 05.05.2021 | SK | 05.05.2021 | SM | 05.05.2021 | BG | 05.08.2021 | NO | 05.08.2021 | GR | 06.08.2021 | IS | 05.09.2021 | PT | 06.09.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 25.03.2015 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CY | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 25.03.2015 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1813139 (POETTINGER OHG ALOIS [AT]) [X] 1,4,6-10,12-15 * abstract * * page 4, paragraphs 26,27 * * page 5, paragraph 35 * * figure -; claim - * [I] 2,3,11; | [XI]EP1285564 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [X] 1,4,6-9,12-14 * abstract * * pages 2,3, paragraph 8 * * figure -; claim - * [I] 2,3,10,15; | [XI]WO2012093958 (VAEDERSTAD VERKEN AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,4,6-9,12-15 * abstract * * page 6, line 28 - page 7, line 3 * * figure -; claim - * [I] 2,3; | [XI]EP1529431 (POETTINGER OHG ALOIS [AT]) [X] 1,4,6-9,12-15 * abstract * * page 6, paragraph 32 * * figure -; claim - * [I] 2,3; | [A]WO03037064 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 1 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP1234489 (VAEDERSTAD VERKEN AB [SE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2010096149 (FRIGGSTAD TERRANCE A [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2, paragraphs 25,26,30 * * figure -; claim - * | Examination | WO2007050185 | by applicant | FR2722362 | US2010096149 | WO03037064 | EP1234489 | EP1285564 |