EP3086256 - METHOD OF MANAGING A SECURE ELEMENT IN A NFC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEMALTO SA 6 Rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foesser, Christophe c/o GEMALTO SA 525, Avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 Gemenos Cedex / FR | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Grevin, Emmanuel, et al Thales Dis France SAS Intellectual Property Department 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 Gémenos Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | Grevin, Emmanuel, et al Gemalto SA 525 avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS 12023 13881 Gemenos Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 15305619.7 | 23.04.2015 | [2016/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3086256 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/77, G06Q20/32 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
G06F21/629 (EP);
G06F21/77 (EP);
G06Q20/3227 (EP);
G06Q20/3229 (EP);
G06Q20/3278 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG EINES SICHEREN ELEMENTS IN EINER NFC-VORRICHTUNG | [2016/43] | English: | METHOD OF MANAGING A SECURE ELEMENT IN A NFC DEVICE | [2016/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR GÉRER UN ÉLÉMENT SÉCURISÉ DANS UN APPAREIL DE TYPE NFC | [2016/43] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/46] | 13.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014058937 (WATSON CURTIS W [US]) [X] 1,4-6,9,10 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0118] * [I] 2,3,7,8; | [XI]US2013111546 (GARGIULO MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6,9,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0143] * [I] 2,3,7,8 |