EP2953047 - ELECTRONIC APPARATUS INCLUDING A SECURE ELECTRONIC ENTITY AND METHOD IMPLEMENTED IN SUCH AN ELECTRONIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMIA France 2 Place Samuel de Champlain 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2019/35] |
Former [2018/22] | For all designated states IDEMIA France 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2015/50] | For all designated states OBERTHUR TECHNOLOGIES 420 rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chamley, Olivier 420 rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | 02 /
Bousquet, Nicolas 420 rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2015/50] | Representative(s) | Jacobacci Coralis Harle 32, rue de l'Arcade 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/50] | Orsini, Fabienne, et al Coralis 14/16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 15305822.7 | 29.05.2015 | [2015/50] | Priority number, date | FR20140055186 | 06.06.2014 Original published format: FR 1455186 | [2015/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2953047 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/34, G06F21/74 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
G06F21/34 (EP,US);
G06F21/57 (CN);
G06F21/31 (CN);
G06F21/72 (US);
G06F21/74 (EP,CN,US);
G06F2221/031 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2149 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] |
Former [2015/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT, DAS EINE GESICHERTE ELEKTRONISCHE EINHEIT UMFASST, UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN IN EINEM SOLCHEN ELEKTRONISCHEN GERÄT | [2015/50] | English: | ELECTRONIC APPARATUS INCLUDING A SECURE ELECTRONIC ENTITY AND METHOD IMPLEMENTED IN SUCH AN ELECTRONIC APPARATUS | [2015/50] | French: | APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE COMPRENANT UNE ENTITÉ ÉLECTRONIQUE SÉCURISÉE ET PROCÉDÉ MIS EN OEUVRE DANS UN TEL APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2015/50] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/13] | 10.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.01.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.01.2020 | 22.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | 23.02.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009254986 (HARRIS PETER WILLIAM [GB], et al) [A] 5* paragraphs [0051] , [0052] *; | [XI]EP2648129 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-4,6,8-14 * paragraphs [0029] - [0096] * * figures 2A,2B,4A,4B * [I] 5,7; | [I]EP2735969 (OBERTHUR TECHNOLOGIES [FR]) [I] 1-5,8,9,14 * paragraphs [0042] - [0075] * |