EP3109029 - FORMING STATION FOR FORMING A CONTAINER FROM A PREFORM COMPRISING A VIBRATORY STRETCH ROD, METHOD FOR FORMING A CONTAINER USING SAID FORMING STATION, METHOD FOR SUPPRESSING FOAM FROM THE NECK OF A CONTAINER USING SAID FORMING STATION AND METHOD FOR CLEANING A FORMING STATION. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/52] | FORMING STATION FOR FORMING A CONTAINER FROM A PREFORM COMPRISING A VIBRATORY STRETCH ROD | ||
[2017/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Discma AG c/o SIDEL INTERNATIONAL AG Bösch 67 6331 Hünenberg / CH | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESOUTTER, Luc c/o SIDEL PARTICIPATIONS Avenue de la Patrouille de France 76930 Octeville-sur-Mer / FR | 02 /
FEUILLOLEY, Guy c/o Sidel Participations Avenue de la Patrouille de France 76930 OCTEVILLE SUR MER / FR | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2016/52] | Application number, filing date | 15306003.3 | 25.06.2015 | [2016/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3109029 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3109029 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/06, B29C49/46, B29C49/42, // B29C49/12 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
B29C49/12 (EP,US);
B29C49/06 (EP,US);
B29C49/4273 (EP,US);
B29C49/46 (EP,US);
B29C2049/023 (EP);
B29C2049/4664 (EP,US);
B29C2791/008 (EP,US);
B29C49/42403 (EP,US);
B29K2067/003 (US);
B29L2031/7158 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] |
Former [2016/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FORMSTATION ZUM FORMEN EINES BEHÄLTERS AUS EINER VORFORM MIT EINER VIBRIERENDEN RECKSTANGE, VERFAHREN ZUM FORMEN EINES BEHÄLTERS MIT DIESER FORMSTATION, VERFAHREN ZUM BESEITIGEN VON SCHAUM IM HALS DES BEHÄLTERS UND VERFAHREN ZUM REINIGEN DER FORMSTATION. | [2017/32] | English: | FORMING STATION FOR FORMING A CONTAINER FROM A PREFORM COMPRISING A VIBRATORY STRETCH ROD, METHOD FOR FORMING A CONTAINER USING SAID FORMING STATION, METHOD FOR SUPPRESSING FOAM FROM THE NECK OF A CONTAINER USING SAID FORMING STATION AND METHOD FOR CLEANING A FORMING STATION. | [2017/32] | French: | STATION DE FORMAGE POUR FORMER UN RÉCIPIENT À PARTIR D'UNE PRÉFORME COMPRENANT UNE TIGE D'ÉTIRAGE VIBRANTE, MÉTHODE DE FABRICATION D'UN RÉCIPIENT UTILISANT LADITE STATION DE FORMAGE, MÉTHODE D'ÉLIMINATION DE LA MOUSSE DANS LE COL D'UN CONTAINER UTILISANT LADITE STATION DE FORMAGE ET MÉTHODE DE NETTOAYGE DE LA STATION DE FORMAGE. | [2017/32] |
Former [2016/52] | FORMSTATION ZUM FORMEN EINES BEHÄLTERS AUS EINER VORFORM MIT EINEM VIBRIERENDEN VORSTRECKSTEMPEL | ||
Former [2016/52] | FORMING STATION FOR FORMING A CONTAINER FROM A PREFORM COMPRISING A VIBRATORY STRETCH ROD | ||
Former [2016/52] | STATION DE FORMAGE POUR FORMER UN RÉCIPIENT À PARTIR D'UNE PRÉFORME COMPRENANT UNE TIGE D'ÉTIRAGE VIBRATOIRE | Examination procedure | 25.06.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 18.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.06.2015 | AL | 13.12.2017 | AT | 13.12.2017 | CY | 13.12.2017 | CZ | 13.12.2017 | DK | 13.12.2017 | EE | 13.12.2017 | ES | 13.12.2017 | FI | 13.12.2017 | HR | 13.12.2017 | LT | 13.12.2017 | LV | 13.12.2017 | MC | 13.12.2017 | MK | 13.12.2017 | NL | 13.12.2017 | PL | 13.12.2017 | PT | 13.12.2017 | RO | 13.12.2017 | RS | 13.12.2017 | SE | 13.12.2017 | SI | 13.12.2017 | SK | 13.12.2017 | SM | 13.12.2017 | TR | 13.12.2017 | BG | 13.03.2018 | NO | 13.03.2018 | GR | 14.03.2018 | IS | 13.04.2018 | IE | 25.06.2018 | LU | 25.06.2018 | MT | 25.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 25.06.2015 | |
AT | 13.12.2017 | ||
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MK | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
IE | 25.06.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
MT | 25.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 25.06.2015 | |
AT | 13.12.2017 | ||
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
IE | 25.06.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
MT | 25.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
IE | 25.06.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
MT | 25.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
IE | 25.06.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
MT | 25.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
IE | 25.06.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
MT | 25.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
IE | 25.06.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
IE | 25.06.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
LU | 25.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
NO | 13.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5254298 (IBAR JEAN-PIERRE [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 9, line 67 - column 10, line 4; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9522447 (THERMOLD PARTNERS LP [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002]; figures 1-8; claims 1,12,14,15 * * page 14, paragraph 5 - page 15, paragraph 1 *; | [A]CA2277660 (DIRADDO ROBERT [CA], et al) [A] 1-15* page 2, paragraph 4 - page 3, paragraph 2; figures 2,3; claims 1,3,6 *; | [A]US2014157726 (CLÜSSERATH LUDWIG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0048] - [0050]; figure 2; claims 23,26 * |