EP3144802 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SYNTHESIZING A SOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2017/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLEUREAU, JULIEN TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE 975 avenue des Champs Blancs 35576 CESSON SEVIGNE CEDEX / FR | 02 /
LEFEVRE, YOAN TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE 975 avenue des Champs Blancs 35576 CESSON SEVIGNE CEDEX / FR | 03 /
GUILLOTEL, PHILIPPE TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE 975 avenue des Champs Blancs 35576 CESSON SEVIGNE CEDEX / FR | [2017/12] | Representative(s) | Huchet, Anne TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2017/12] | Application number, filing date | 15306420.9 | 16.09.2015 | [2017/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3144802 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/16, G06F3/041, G06K15/02 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
G06F3/167 (EP,US);
G10H7/00 (KR);
G10L13/033 (CN);
G06F3/03547 (EP,US);
G06F3/041 (EP,US);
G06F3/165 (EP,US);
G06K15/02 (US);
G10H5/02 (KR);
G10H7/002 (KR);
G10H7/08 (KR);
G10L15/06 (CN);
G10L15/22 (CN);
G10H2210/101 (KR);
G10H2220/311 (KR);
G10L2015/223 (CN);
G10L2015/226 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KLANGSYNTHESE | [2017/12] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SYNTHESIZING A SOUND | [2017/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE SYNTHÉTISER UN SON | [2017/12] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/12] | 31.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - CHUNG HANWOOK ET AL, "Modeling and Real-Time Generation of Pen Stroke Sounds for Tactile Devices", CONFERENCE: 49TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE: AUDIO FOR GAMES; 20130201, AES, 60 EAST 42ND STREET, ROOM 2520 NEW YORK 10165-2520, USA, (20130206), pages 1 - 6, XP040574957 [X] 1-3,7-9,13,14 * abstract * * page 1, column l, paragraph 2 * * 2.1 System overview; page 2, column l * * 2.3 Pen speed modeling; page 3, column l * [I] 4-6,10-12 | [X] - ZHIMIN REN ET AL, "Synthesizing contact sounds between textured models", VIRTUAL REALITY CONFERENCE (VR), 2010 IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100320), ISBN 978-1-4244-6237-7, pages 139 - 146, XP031656111 [X] 1,7,13,14 * abstract * * 6.1 User Interface; page 143; figures 1-4,8a-c * * 5.1 Contact Categorization, The part about lasting contacts; page 142, column r; figure 5b * | by applicant | - SHLOMO DUBNOV, YASAS - YET ANOTHER SOUND ANALYSIS-SYNTHESIS METHOD | - F.S. SCHLINDWEIN; D.H. EVANS, AUTOREGRESSIVE SPECTRAL ANALYSIS AS AN ALTERNATIVE TO FAST FOURIER TRANSFORM ANALYSIS OF DOPPLER ULTRASOUND SIGNALS, pages 74 - 84 |