EP3150618 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF SELAMECTIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIRBAC 1ère Avenue - 2065 M - L.I.D. 06516 Carros / FR | [2017/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOUTOU, Jean-Luc 39 avenue Ziem 06800 Cagnes-sur-mer / FR | 02 /
GUIGO, Agnès 23 rue du soleil 06100 Nice / FR | 03 /
SURENDRA MOHILE, Swapnil Valentina 1303 Lodha Paradise-Majiwade Thane (West) 400601 Maharashtra / IN | 04 /
MAHADEV KINAGE, Yogesh Rudramani, Plot n° 116 B, Sector n°2 Indrayaninagar Bhosari, Pune 411026 Maharashtra / IN | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | Gevers & Orès 41 avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 15306526.3 | 29.09.2015 | [2017/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3150618 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07H17/08, C07H1/00 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
C07H17/08 (EP);
C07H1/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SELAMECTIN | [2017/14] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF SELAMECTIN | [2017/14] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA PREPARATION DE SELAMECTIN | [2017/14] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/11] | 16.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 30.09.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 30.09.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5981500 (BISHOP BERNARD FRANK [GB], et al) [AD] 1-5 * column 9 - column 10; examples 4-5, 8-9 *; | [A]WO9415944 (PFIZER [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 17 - page 19; examples 5, 9 *; | [A] - BRUCE MICHAEL ET AL, "Comparison of Ivermectin, Doramectin, Selamectin, and Eleven Intermediates in a Nematode Larval Development Assay", THE JOURNAL OF PARASITOLOGY, US, (20010601), vol. 87, no. 3, doi:10.1645/0022-3395(2001)087[0692:COIDSA]2.0.CO;2, ISSN 0022-3395, pages 692 - 696, XP055227484 [A] 1-5 * page 693; compounds 1, 2, 3, 4, 6, 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1645/0022-3395(2001)087[0692:COIDSA]2.0.CO;2 | [A] - BANKS B J ET AL, "Avermectins and flea control: structure-activity relationships and the selection of selamectin for development as an endectocide for companion animals", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 8, no. 8, ISSN 0968-0896, (20000801), pages 2017 - 2025, (20000801), XP027414349 [A] 1-5 * page 2020; compounds 26, 32, 33 * | [T] - BIOCATALYSIS FOR THE PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRY: DISCOVERY, DEVELOPMENT, AND MANUFACTURING,, PAGE(S) 281 - 285, (20090701), XP009187170 [T] 1-5 * page 284; figure 13.9 * | by applicant | US5981500 | WO9907721 | US6906184 | WO2013149577 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1969), vol. 34, no. 6, pages 1979 - 1981 |