EP3175714 - SYNEGISTIC INSECTICIDAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING THIAMETHOXAM AND N-BUTYL-N-ACETYL-3-ETHYLAMINE PROPIONATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/23] | SYNEGISTIC INSECTICIDAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING THIAMETHOXAM AND INSECT REPELLENTS | ||
[2018/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITE D'ANGERS 40, rue de Rennes 49035 Angers / FR | [2017/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOULU, Mathilde 23 rue Bouchetière 49140 FONTAINE-MILON / FR | 02 /
APAIRE-MARCHAIS, Véronique 9 rue G. Brassens 49100 ANGERS / FR | 03 /
LIST, Olivier 80 rue de la Chataigneraie 49080 BOUCHEMAINE / FR | 04 /
RAYMOND, Valérie 7 impasse de la Bayotière 49080 BOUCHEMAINE / FR | 05 /
LAPIED, Bruno 23 rue des Terras 49100 ANGERS / FR | [2017/23] | Representative(s) | Le Cloirec, Claudine Ipsilon 3, rue Edouard Nignon 44300 Nantes / FR | [2017/23] | Application number, filing date | 15306929.9 | 04.12.2015 | [2017/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3175714 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3175714 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A01P7/04, A01N51/00, A01N37/18, A01N37/46 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
A01N51/00 (EP,US);
A01N25/28 (US);
A01N37/18 (US);
A01N37/44 (US)
| C-Set: |
A01N51/00, A01N37/18, A01N37/20, A01N37/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] |
Former [2017/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYNERGISTISCHE INSEKTIZIDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENHALTEND THIAMETHOXAM UND N-BUTYL-N-ACETYL-3-ETHYLAMINPROPIONAT | [2018/35] | English: | SYNEGISTIC INSECTICIDAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING THIAMETHOXAM AND N-BUTYL-N-ACETYL-3-ETHYLAMINE PROPIONATE | [2018/35] | French: | COMPOSITIONS SYNERGIQUES D'INSECTICIDE COMPRENANT THIAMÉTHOXAM ET N-BUTYL-N-ACÉTYL-3-ÉTHYLAMINE PROPIONATE | [2018/35] |
Former [2017/23] | SYNERGISTISCHE INSEKTIZIDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENHALTEND THIAMETHOXAM UND INSEKTEN-REPELLENTIEN | ||
Former [2017/23] | SYNEGISTIC INSECTICIDAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING THIAMETHOXAM AND INSECT REPELLENTS | ||
Former [2017/23] | COMPOSITIONS SYNERGIQUES D'INSECTICIDE COMPRENANT THIAMÉTHOXAM ET DES RÉPULSIFS | Examination procedure | 04.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 16.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2015 | AL | 16.01.2019 | AT | 16.01.2019 | CY | 16.01.2019 | CZ | 16.01.2019 | DK | 16.01.2019 | EE | 16.01.2019 | ES | 16.01.2019 | FI | 16.01.2019 | HR | 16.01.2019 | IT | 16.01.2019 | LT | 16.01.2019 | LV | 16.01.2019 | MC | 16.01.2019 | MK | 16.01.2019 | MT | 16.01.2019 | NL | 16.01.2019 | PL | 16.01.2019 | RO | 16.01.2019 | RS | 16.01.2019 | SE | 16.01.2019 | SI | 16.01.2019 | SK | 16.01.2019 | SM | 16.01.2019 | TR | 16.01.2019 | BG | 16.04.2019 | NO | 16.04.2019 | GR | 17.04.2019 | IS | 16.05.2019 | PT | 16.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 04.12.2015 | |
AL | 16.01.2019 | ||
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CY | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
MT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 04.12.2015 | |
AL | 16.01.2019 | ||
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CY | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CY | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 16.01.2019 | |
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 16.01.2019 | |
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 16.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2004064522 (BAYER HEALTHCARE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,7-12 * examples 1-13 * [Y] 4,6; | [XY]WO2004098290 (BAYER HEALTHCARE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,7-12 * examples 10a,11 * [Y] 4,6; | [Y]WO2005079577 (INST RECH DEVELOPPEMENT IRD [FR], et al) [Y] 4,6 * claims 1-14 * * examples 1-2 *; | [XY]AU2013237746B (DEEPAK PRANJIVANDAS SHAH [IN]) [X] 1-3,7-12 * example 13 * [Y] 4,6; | [XY] - FRÉDÉRIC DARRIET ET AL, "Efficacy of six neonicotinoid insecticides alone and in combination with deltamethrin and piperonyl butoxide against pyrethroid-resistant Aedes aegypti and Anopheles gambiae (Diptera: Culicidae)", PEST MANAGEMENT SCIENCE, BOGNOR REGIS; GB, (20121204), vol. 69, no. 8, doi:10.1002/ps.3446, ISSN 1526-498X, pages 905 - 910, XP055240199 [X] 1-3,7-12 * the whole document * [Y] 4,6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ps.3446 | [L] - * Commanding ET AL, (20040101), pages 27 - 6, URL: http://medind.nic.in/maa/t07/i2/maat07i2p120.pdf, (20160112), XP055240499 [L] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | - BONNET J. ET AL., "Multi-function oxidases are responsible for the synergistic interactions occurring between repellents and insecticides in mosquitoes", PARASITES & VECTORS, (2009), vol. 2, page 17 | - LAPIED ET AL., "/on/c species involved in the electrical activity of single adult aminergic neurones isolated from sixth abdominal ganglion of cockroach Periplaneta americana", J EXP BIOL, (1989), vol. 144, pages 535 - 49 |