EP2924836 - A NEW TYPE OF POWER CORD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kallitsis, Efthimios Leoforos Varis-Koropiou & Makedonias 1 16672 Vari Attikis / GR | [2015/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/40] | Application number, filing date | 15386009.3 | 24.03.2015 | [2015/40] | Priority number, date | GR20140100156 | 26.03.2014 Original published format: GR 20140100156 | [2015/40] | Filing language | EL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2924836 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2924836 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02G11/02, B65H75/40 | [2015/46] | CPC: |
H02G11/02 (EP,GR);
B65H75/44 (GR);
B65H75/403 (EP,GR);
B65H75/4423 (GR);
B65H75/4471 (EP,GR);
B65H75/4486 (GR);
B65H2701/34 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/40] | H02G11/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUER NETZKABELTYP | [2015/40] | English: | A NEW TYPE OF POWER CORD | [2015/40] | French: | NOUVEAU TYPE DE CORDON D'ALIMENTATION | [2015/40] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/45] | 20.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2824196 (HELI 33 SOC D EXPL DES ETABLIS [FR]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1-4; claims 1-5 *; | [A]DE7708615U (SCHIEDERWERK GÜNTHER SCHMIDT) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10027472 (SCHWARZ UDO [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1a-5; claims 1,4,8,9,11 *; | [A]DE1276154 (SEGER & ANGERMEYER DESCO WERK) [A] 1 * the whole document * |