EP2923544 - PNEUMATIC SINGLE GRAIN SOWING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/40] | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brüggemann, Klaus Bürsteler Str. 11 27777 Ganderkesee / DE | 02 /
Mertens, Daniel Friesenstraße 5 26121 Oldenburg / DE | 03 /
Wien, Thomas Spohnberg 4a 28816 Stuhr / DE | [2015/50] |
Former [2015/40] | 01 /
* * * | ||
02 /
* * * | |||
03 /
* * * | Application number, filing date | 15401024.3 | 17.03.2015 | [2015/40] | Priority number, date | DE201410104154 | 26.03.2014 Original published format: DE102014104154 | [2015/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2923544 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2923544 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01C7/04 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
A01C7/046 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/40] | A01C7/04, A01C7/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/10] |
Former [2015/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PNEUMATISCHE EINZELKORNSÄMASCHINE | [2015/40] | English: | PNEUMATIC SINGLE GRAIN SOWING MACHINE | [2015/40] | French: | SEMOIR MONOGRAINE PNEUMATIQUE | [2015/40] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/10] | 06.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2015 | AL | 19.10.2016 | CY | 19.10.2016 | CZ | 19.10.2016 | DK | 19.10.2016 | EE | 19.10.2016 | ES | 19.10.2016 | FI | 19.10.2016 | HR | 19.10.2016 | IT | 19.10.2016 | LT | 19.10.2016 | LV | 19.10.2016 | MC | 19.10.2016 | MK | 19.10.2016 | MT | 19.10.2016 | NL | 19.10.2016 | PL | 19.10.2016 | RO | 19.10.2016 | RS | 19.10.2016 | SI | 19.10.2016 | SK | 19.10.2016 | SM | 19.10.2016 | TR | 19.10.2016 | BG | 19.01.2017 | NO | 19.01.2017 | GR | 20.01.2017 | IS | 19.02.2017 | PT | 20.02.2017 | IE | 17.03.2017 | LU | 17.03.2017 | BE | 31.03.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 17.03.2015 | |
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MK | 19.10.2016 | ||
MT | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
TR | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 17.03.2017 | ||
LU | 17.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 17.03.2015 | |
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MK | 19.10.2016 | ||
MT | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 17.03.2017 | ||
LU | 17.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 17.03.2015 | |
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MT | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 17.03.2017 | ||
LU | 17.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.03.2015 | |
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MT | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 17.03.2017 | ||
LU | 17.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MT | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 17.03.2017 | ||
LU | 17.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 17.03.2017 | ||
LU | 17.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 17.03.2017 | ||
LU | 17.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
LU | 17.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 19.10.2016 | |
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | ES | 19.10.2016 | |
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 19.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2242272 (FAEHSE & CO H) [AD] 1 * figures 1,2 * * page 6, paragraph 4 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 12 - page 14, paragraph 2 *; | [A]WO2011056138 (VAEDERSTAD VERKEN AB [SE], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,2,3,5,6 * * page 1, lines 11-15,25-26 * * page 3, lines 27-30 * * page 5, lines 10-16 * * page 6, line 10 - page 7, line 31 * * page 10, line 6 - page 12, line 2 * * page 12, lines 20-25 * * page 13, lines 10-20 *; | [A]US2009000533 (WENDTE KEITH W [US]) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0029] - [0032]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4449642 (DOOLEY JAMES H [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-6 * * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 20 *; | [A]WO03055291 (PREC PLANTING INC [US]) [A] 1 * figures 2-4 *; | [AD]EP2702849 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [AD] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] * | by applicant | DE2242272 | EP0598636 | EP2702849 |