EP3111549 - ELECTRIC DRIVE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2017/01] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHROEDER, Carsten Ahornweg 1 71732 Tamm / DE | 02 /
BRAUN, Martin Forchenstr. 8 72149 Neustetten-Wolfenhausen / DE | 03 /
BUTZMANN, Stefan Mühlenweg 18 58579 Schalksmühle / DE | [2017/01] | Application number, filing date | 15700349.2 | 08.01.2015 | [2017/01] | WO2015EP50223 | Priority number, date | DE201410203550 | 27.02.2014 Original published format: DE102014203550 | [2017/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015128104 | Date: | 03.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3111549 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02P25/22, H02P27/06 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
H02P27/06 (EP,US);
B60L15/007 (EP,US);
B60L50/51 (EP,US);
B60L58/21 (EP,US);
H02P25/03 (US);
H02P25/08 (US);
H02P25/22 (EP,US);
B60L2220/12 (EP,US);
B60L2220/14 (EP,US);
B60L2220/16 (EP,US);
B60L2220/18 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES ANTRIEBSSYSTEM | [2017/01] | English: | ELECTRIC DRIVE SYSTEM | [2017/01] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT ÉLECTRIQUE | [2017/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 08.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]DE102012207534 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1-4 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0120]; figures 1,3,4,5,7,10; claims 8,9 * * paragraph [0147] * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0026] *; | [I]DE19745578 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [I] 1-4 * column 5, line 52 - column 9, line 14; figures 3-6,7-9 * * column 12, line 19 - column 15, line 65 *; | [I]WO2013042741 (ROHM CO LTD [JP], et al) [I] 1-4 * figures 1,2,3 *; | [IP]EP2760121 (ROHM CO LTD [JP]) [IP] 1-4 * paragraph [0002]; figures 1,2,3 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0079] *; | [A]WO2013146212 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4 * figures 4B, 5 *; | [AP]US2014367736 (IIZUKA YUJI [JP], et al) [AP] 1-4 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0082]; figures 4B,5 *; | [A]WO2006131210 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-4 * page 5, line 1 - page 8, line 27; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US2007070667 | DE102011085731 | DE102008008978 | DE102010001250 |