EP3097349 - AN ILLUMINATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nualight Limited Cork Business & Technology Park Model Farm Road Cork / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/48] | For all designated states Nualight Limited Cork Business & Technology Park Model Farm Road Cork / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUH, Andreas Korte Geuzenstraat 11-3 NL-1056 KR Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
CRONIN, Andrew Fnidsen 65-67 NL-1811 NE Alkmaar / NL | 03 /
LINEHAN, Daniel 9b Sidney Place Wellington Road Cork / IE | 04 /
BLANDIN, Christian 181 An Caislean Ballincollig County Cork / IE | [2016/48] | Representative(s) | Weldon, Michael James, et al John A. O'Brien & Associates Unit 4, The Courtyard Business Centre Orchard Lane Blackrock, County Dublin, A94 NV07 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/48] | Weldon, Michael James, et al John A. O'Brien & Associates Third Floor Duncairn House 14 Carysfort Avenue Blackrock, Co. Dublin / IE | Application number, filing date | 15701174.3 | 21.01.2015 | [2016/48] | WO2015EP51103 | Priority number, date | EP20140152275 | 23.01.2014 Original published format: EP 14152275 | [2016/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015110455 | Date: | 30.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3097349 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F21V15/015, F21V23/04, F21S4/28, F21V31/00, // F21S9/02, F21V17/00, F21Y115/10, F21Y103/10 | [2018/02] | CPC: |
F21V23/0471 (EP,US);
F21S4/28 (EP,US);
F21S9/024 (EP,US);
F21V15/005 (US);
F21V15/015 (EP,US);
F21V17/002 (EP,US);
F21V3/00 (US);
F21V31/005 (EP,US);
F21Y2103/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/48] | F21S4/00, F21S9/02, F21V15/015, F21V17/00, F21Y101/00, F21Y103/00, F21V23/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/48] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM | [2016/48] | English: | AN ILLUMINATION SYSTEM | [2016/48] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2016/48] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/48] | 17.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/46] | 26.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE202006000801U (CHEN CHUEN SHING [TW]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0029] * * figures 2, 5, 6 * [I] 2-5,8,10-13,21; | [A]US2013094225 (LEICHNER ERIC S [US]) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0051] * * figures 1-13 *; | [A]DE202013000999U (SCHAHLLED LIGHTING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document * |