EP3092257 - PROCESSES FOR PREPARING METALLOCENE-BASED CATALYST SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LP 10001 Six Pines Drive The Woodlands, Texas 77380 / US | [2016/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CYMBALUK, Ted H. PO Box 823 Seabrook, Texas 77586 / US | 02 /
MCDANIEL, Max P 1601 Melmart Drive Bartlesville, Oklahoma 74006 / US | 03 /
YANG, Qing 2917 Montrose Drive Bartlesville, Oklahoma 74006 / US | 04 /
HOLTERMANN, Dennis L. 3 Melville Glen Place Conroe, Texas 77384 / US | 05 /
CRAIN, Tony R 474 Road 30 Niotaze, Kansas 67355 / US | [2016/46] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [2024/09] |
Former [2016/46] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15701599.1 | 05.01.2015 | [2016/46] | WO2015US10136 | Priority number, date | US201414151848 | 10.01.2014 Original published format: US201414151848 | [2016/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015105750 | Date: | 16.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3092257 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3092257 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/6592, C08F210/02 | [2016/46] | CPC: |
C08F4/65916 (EP,US);
C08F210/16 (CN,US);
C08F110/02 (CN);
C08F4/65904 (US);
C08F4/65925 (EP,US);
C08F4/65927 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (US);
C08F2410/07 (EP);
C08F2500/12 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F110/02, C08F4/65925 (CN);
C08F110/02, C08F4/65927 (CN);
C08F210/16, C08F4/65904 (EP,US);
C08F210/16, C08F4/6592 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F4/65925 (CN);
C08F210/16, C08F4/65927 (CN); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METALLOCENBASIERTEN KATALYSATORSYSTEMEN | [2016/46] | English: | PROCESSES FOR PREPARING METALLOCENE-BASED CATALYST SYSTEMS | [2016/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION DE SYSTÈMES CATALYSEURS À BASE DE MÉTALLOCÈNES | [2016/46] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/46] | 17.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.10.2020 | 09.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 28.02.2024 | ES | 28.02.2024 | FI | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | LT | 28.02.2024 | LV | 28.02.2024 | NL | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | SE | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | PT | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
LV | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
PL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
PT | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6524987 (COLLINS KATHY S [US], et al) [A] 1 * examples 12-14,18-20,23-24,26,29-32,34; table 1 *; | [A]US7041617 (JENSEN MICHAEL D [US], et al) [A] 1 * examples 1-9 *; | [X]US2007255028 (RAZAVI ABBAS [BE], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0227] - paragraph [0238]; examples A-F; table 1 * * paragraph [0209] - paragraph [0210] *; | [X]US7619047 (YANG QING [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7; | [X]US2010331501 (MURRAY REX E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 * paragraph [0259]; examples 3-6; table I * * paragraphs [0215] , [0217] *; | [X]US7960487 (YANG QING [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 * figure 1; examples 1-6; table 1 *; | [X]US2012077665 (DING ERRUN [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7 * paragraphs [0152] , [0153] , [0155] * * table 1, samples 1-13 ** paragraph [0105] * | by applicant | US3248179 | US4501885 | US4588790 | US5352749 | US5436304 | US5455314 | US5565175 | US5575979 | US6107230 | US6165929 | US6239235 | US6262191 | US6294494 | US6300271 | US6316553 | US6355594 | US6376415 | US6388017 | US6391816 | US6395666 | US6524987 | US6548441 | US6548442 | US6576583 | US6613712 | US6632894 | US6667274 | US6750302 | US6833415 | US7026494 | US7041617 | US7199073 | US7226886 | US7294599 | US7300983 | US7312283 | US7517939 | US7601665 | US7619047 | US7884163 | US7919639 | US8080681 | US8309485 | - MODERN PLASTICS ENCYCLOPEDIA, (199511), vol. 72, no. 12 |