EP3099288 - STABILIZED GASTRORETENTIVE TABLETS OF PREGABALIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd Sun House, Plot N°. 201 B/1 Western Express Highway Goregoan (E) 400063 Mumbai, Maharashtra / IN | [2016/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAR, Varinder House No. 724 Swastik Vihar Zirakpur-Patiala Road Zirakpur Mohali Punjab 140 603 / IN | 02 /
AHMAD, Shavej B 1/31 Sector D1 LDA Colony Kanpur Road, Lucknow 226 012 Lucknow Uttar Pradesh 226 012 / IN | 03 /
SINGH, Romi, Barat A-14 Badshah Bagh Varanasi Uttar Pradesh 221 002 / IN | 04 /
NAYYAR, Kaushal House No. 1345 Sector - 17C Gurgaon Haryana 122 001 / IN | 05 /
PRASAD, Mohan H. No. P-3/3, Phase-II DLF Qutab Enclave Gurgaon Haryana 122001 / IN | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | Cronin, Brian Harold John CRONIN Intellectual Property Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [2016/49] | Application number, filing date | 15702013.2 | 26.01.2015 | [2016/49] | WO2015IB50587 | Priority number, date | IN2014DEL252 | 28.01.2014 Original published format: IN 252DE2014 | [2017/16] |
Former [2016/49] | IN2014DEL0252 | 28.01.2014 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015114509 | Date: | 06.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3099288 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K31/197 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
A61K9/0065 (EP,US);
A61K31/197 (EP,US);
A61K9/2009 (US);
A61K9/2013 (US);
A61K9/2027 (US);
A61K9/2031 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/49] | Title | German: | STABILISIERTE GASTRORETENTIVE PREGABALINTABLETTEN | [2016/49] | English: | STABILIZED GASTRORETENTIVE TABLETS OF PREGABALIN | [2016/49] | French: | COMPRIMÉS À RÉTENTION GASTRIQUE STABILISÉE DE PRÉGABALINE | [2016/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/49] | 01.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/02] | 31.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2013114283 (RANBAXY LAB LTD [IN]) [X] 1-6 * examples 11-21; claims 1-10 *; | [X]WO2011151708 (RUBICON RES PRIVATE LTD [IN]; PILGAONKAR PRATIBHA SUDHIR [IN]; RUSTOMJ) [X] 1-6 * examples 5-7 *; | [X]WO2007048223 (PHARMASCIENCE INC [CA]; AURORA JACK [CA]; SANT VINAYAK [CA]) [X] 1-6 * page 17; table A * * page 18; table 1 * * page 20; table 2 * * page 21; table 2b * * page 23; table 6 * * page 28, lines 5-10 *; | [X]WO2011053003 (CJ CHEILJEDANG CORP [KR]; CHO IL HWAN [KR]; HONG IL KI [KR]; SHIN KYUN) [X] 1-6 * examples 1-12 * | by applicant | US6197819 | US2007269511 | WO2010143052 | US7309719 | US2009156677 |