EP3091913 - DEVICE FOR LOCATING AN ENTRY POINT OF A PEDICLE OF A VERTEBRA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safe Orthopaedics Allée Rosa Luxembourg 95610 Eragny-sur-Oise / FR | [2016/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOUAILLAT, Hervé Chemin de Grange Neuve F-38610 Venon / FR | [2016/46] | Representative(s) | IP Trust 2, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [2016/46] | Application number, filing date | 15702545.3 | 09.01.2015 | [2016/46] | WO2015FR50045 | Priority number, date | FR20140050164 | 10.01.2014 Original published format: FR 1450164 | [2016/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015104507 | Date: | 16.07.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3091913 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/17, A61B17/70, A61B17/88, A61B17/90 | [2016/46] | CPC: |
A61B17/1757 (EP,US);
A61B17/8875 (US);
A61B17/8866 (EP,US);
A61B17/8897 (EP,US);
A61B17/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/46] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ORTUNG EINES EINTRITTSPUNKTES EINER PEDIKELSCHRAUBE EINES WIRBELS | [2016/46] | English: | DEVICE FOR LOCATING AN ENTRY POINT OF A PEDICLE OF A VERTEBRA | [2016/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LOCALISATION D'UN POINT D'ENTREE D'UN PEDICULE D'UNE VERTEBRE | [2016/46] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/46] | 07.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/27] | 25.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE9217816U (SYNTHES AG [CH]) [Y] 4,6-10 * page 5, paragraph last - page 7, paragraph last; figures 1,3,4 *; | [I]US5746743 (GREENBERG ALEX M [US]) [I] 1-9 * column 12, lines 32-34; figures 14-16 *; | [I]WO02096294 (GREEN JAMES M [US], et al) [I] 1-5 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 2; figures 2,3,21 * * page 9, line 35 - page 10, line 2 *; | [A]EP1284122 (DEPUY ACROMED INC [US]) [A] 1-11* figures 1,3,6 *; | [I]US2007244489 (PATEL TUSHAR [US], et al) [I] 1,8-11 * paragraphs [0029] , [0032] , [0033] , [0040]; figures 2-4 *; | [XY]US2012150242 (MANNION RICHARD [US]) [X] 1-3,5,11 * paragraphs [0031] - [0034]; figures 2,3 * [Y] 4,6-10 | by applicant | US2004073229 |