EP3100356 - DIGITAL PERIOD DIVIDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microchip Technology Incorporated 2355 West Chandler Boulevard Chandler, AZ 85224-6199 / US | [2016/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JULICHER, Joseph 43534 West Elizabeth Avenue Maricopa, AZ 85138 / US | 02 /
KILZER, Kevin 131 East Redfield Road Chandler, AZ 85225 / US | 03 /
VAN EEDEN, Cobus 795 West Beechnut Drive Chandler, AZ 85248 / US | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | sgb europe Bergstrasse 31 82069 Hohenschäftlarn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/49] | Grubert, Andreas c/o Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Herzog-Wilhelm-Straße 26 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15703421.6 | 29.01.2015 | [2016/49] | WO2015US13513 | Priority number, date | US201461934218P | 31.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461934218 P | [2016/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015116813 | Date: | 06.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3100356 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H03K21/38, G01P3/481, G01P3/486, G01P3/488, G01P3/489, H02P6/16 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
G01P3/481 (EP,KR,US);
H03K21/38 (EP,KR,US);
H03K23/64 (CN);
G01D5/142 (KR,US);
G01D5/2451 (EP,KR,US);
G01D5/26 (KR,US);
G01P3/486 (EP,US);
G01P3/488 (EP,US);
G01P3/489 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/49] | Title | German: | DIGITALER PERIODENDIVIDIERER | [2016/49] | English: | DIGITAL PERIOD DIVIDER | [2016/49] | French: | DIVISEUR DE PÉRIODE NUMÉRIQUE | [2016/49] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/49] | 05.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.10.2024 | 02.10.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2653351 (MABCO WESTINGHOUSE GMBH); | [A]US2003062863 (HUANG BIING-HUANG [TW], et al); | [XA]US2008255796 (TAKEUCHI KESATOSHI [JP]) |