EP3086869 - CONTROLLING A USER INTERFACE OF A COMPUTER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.05.2022 [2022/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states King.com Limited Aragon House Business Centre Dragonara Road St. Julians STJ 3140 / MT | [2016/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSSON, Magnus Sveavägen 44 111 34 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
ALFTBERG, Niclas Sveavägen 44 111 34 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
NYBLOM, Tobias Sveavägen 44 111 34 Stockholm / SE | 04 /
JAKSCH, Rikard Sveavägen 44 111 34 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/44] | 01 /
HANSSON, Magnus c/o Midasplayer AB Sankt Eriksgatan 113 113 43 Stockholm / SE | ||
02 /
ALFTBERG, Niclas c/o Midasplayer AB Sankt Eriksgatan 113 113 43 Stockholm / SE | |||
03 /
NYBLOM, Tobias c/o MidasplayerAB Sankt Eriksgatan 113 113 43 Stockholm / SE | |||
04 /
JAKSCH, Rikard c/o Midasplayer AB Sankt Eriksgatan 113 113 43 Stockholm / SE | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/44] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 15703759.9 | 30.01.2015 | [2016/44] | WO2015EP52000 | Priority number, date | GB20140001717 | 31.01.2014 Original published format: GB 201401717 | US201414183997 | 19.02.2014 Original published format: US201414183997 | US201414316274 | 26.06.2014 Original published format: US201414316274 | [2016/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015114117 | Date: | 06.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3086869 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/80, A63F13/57 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
A63F13/80 (EP,KR);
A63F13/20 (KR);
A63F13/57 (EP,KR);
A63F2300/308 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] | Title | German: | STEUERUNG EINER BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLE EINER COMPUTERVORRICHTUNG | [2016/44] | English: | CONTROLLING A USER INTERFACE OF A COMPUTER DEVICE | [2016/44] | French: | COMMANDE D'INTERFACE UTILISATEUR DE DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE | [2016/44] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 13.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/20] | 11.04.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.05.2022 | 10.05.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI] - Anonymous, "iPhone Game 'Trism' breaks $250.000. Review. - [Updated] | razorianflyofficial", (20080926), URL: https://razorianflyofficial.wordpress.com/2008/09/25/iphone-game-trism-breaks-250000-review/, (20150415), XP055183153 [X] 1-7,9,12,13,15,16,19-21,30 * the whole document * [Y] 18,25,26 [I] 8,10,11,14,17,22-24 | [XOY] - Steve Demeter, "Trism : Upcoming iPhone Game by Demiforce", (20080226), URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=hy0ptZisr70, (20150416), XP054975820 [XO] 27-29 * 0:33-0:42; 1:21-1:25 * [Y] 18,25,26 | [IOA] - Sergio Rua, "Candy Crush Saga Gameplay First Look (Episode 1 - 10 levels)", (20120415), URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=8TIeNDnJiN8, (20150416), XP054975821 [IO] 1,19,30 * 0:00-11:55 * [A] 14 |