EP3080356 - RAIL VEHICLE COMPRISING SNOW PLOUGH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Opposition rejected | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Mobility GmbH Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2018/44] |
Former [2017/35] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2016/42] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEGE, Alexander Sigmundstr. 17 86157 Augsburg / DE | 02 /
MELDE, Jörg Leopoldstr. 29 82140 Olching / DE | 03 /
MEYER, Joachim Palmstr. 16 80469 München / DE | 04 /
PFORR, Jörg Osteranger 9 85665 Moosach / DE | [2016/42] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 15705230.9 | 06.02.2015 | [2016/42] | WO2015EP52471 | Priority number, date | DE201410203734 | 28.02.2014 Original published format: DE102014203734 | [2016/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015128166 | Date: | 03.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3080356 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3080356 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B61F19/06, E01H8/04, B61F19/04 | [2018/02] | CPC: |
E01H5/061 (EP,US);
B61F19/04 (EP,RU,US);
B61F19/06 (EP,US);
E01H8/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/42] | E01H8/04, B61F19/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHIENENFAHRZEUG MIT EINEM SCHNEERÄUMER | [2016/42] | English: | RAIL VEHICLE COMPRISING SNOW PLOUGH | [2016/42] | French: | VÉHICULE SUR RAILS COMPRENANT UN CHASSE-NEIGE | [2016/42] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/42] | 27.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 15.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.01.2019
31.01.2019
ADMISSIBLE Bombardier Transportation GmbH Eichhornstraße 3 10785 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | [2019/10] | 16.04.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.08.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.11.2020 | 25.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.12.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.12.2021 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 28.02.2024 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2024/22] | Appeal following opposition | 31.01.2022 | Appeal received No. T0251/22 | 31.01.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 07.04.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.02.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.02.2015 | AL | 25.04.2018 | CY | 25.04.2018 | DK | 25.04.2018 | EE | 25.04.2018 | HR | 25.04.2018 | LT | 25.04.2018 | LV | 25.04.2018 | MC | 25.04.2018 | MK | 25.04.2018 | MT | 25.04.2018 | NL | 25.04.2018 | RO | 25.04.2018 | RS | 25.04.2018 | SI | 25.04.2018 | SK | 25.04.2018 | SM | 25.04.2018 | BG | 25.07.2018 | GR | 26.07.2018 | IS | 25.08.2018 | PT | 27.08.2018 | GB | 06.02.2019 | IE | 06.02.2019 | LU | 06.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | AT | 06.02.2020 | TR | 06.02.2020 | PL | 06.02.2022 | NO | 28.02.2022 | [2023/26] |
Former [2022/47] | HU | 06.02.2015 | |
AL | 25.04.2018 | ||
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
MK | 25.04.2018 | ||
MT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.08.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
GB | 06.02.2019 | ||
IE | 06.02.2019 | ||
LU | 06.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
AT | 06.02.2020 | ||
TR | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | HU | 06.02.2015 | |
AL | 25.04.2018 | ||
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
MK | 25.04.2018 | ||
MT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.08.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
GB | 06.02.2019 | ||
IE | 06.02.2019 | ||
LU | 06.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
AT | 06.02.2020 | ||
TR | 06.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 06.02.2015 | |
AL | 25.04.2018 | ||
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
MT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.08.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
GB | 06.02.2019 | ||
IE | 06.02.2019 | ||
LU | 06.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
AT | 06.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
MT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.08.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
GB | 06.02.2019 | ||
IE | 06.02.2019 | ||
LU | 06.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
AT | 06.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
MT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
GB | 06.02.2019 | ||
IE | 06.02.2019 | ||
LU | 06.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
AT | 06.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
MT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
GB | 06.02.2019 | ||
IE | 06.02.2019 | ||
LU | 06.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
GB | 06.02.2019 | ||
IE | 06.02.2019 | ||
LU | 06.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
IE | 06.02.2019 | ||
LU | 06.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 06.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 06.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | HR | 25.04.2018 | |
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | HR | 25.04.2018 | |
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | HR | 25.04.2018 | |
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | HR | 25.04.2018 | |
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | LT | 25.04.2018 | |
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 25.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US1207789 (PACKER EBEN R [US]) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [Y]US345257 (A.F.PRIEST) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]US1518685 (JOHN BERCZIK) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS63141220U (A) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 *; | [AD]US51829 (C.L. HEYWOOD) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US289705 (W. PHILLIPS) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS4897209 (A) [A] 2 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]US517478 (J.OLSON) [A] 3 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1070792 | JPH10252030 | US6688021 | US51829 | DE102009019576 | DE19933914 | DE19933915 | Opposition | US51829 | US289705 | US345257 | US517478 | US1207789 | US1518685 | JPS4897209 | JPS63141220U | JPH10252030 | EP1070791 | DE19933914 | DE19933915 | US6688021 | EP1070792 | US2009307940 | DE102009019576 | WO2010124925 | WO2015043661 | WO2015128166 | - LOEBER M; ET AL, "INNOVATIVE CRASHFAEHIGE KASTENSTRUKTUR DER TRAXX-LOKOMOTIVEN//INNOVATIVE CRASHWORTHY CARBODY STRUCTURE OF THE TRAXX LOCOMOTIVE//UNE STRUCTURE DE CAISSE INNOVANTE ET RESISTANTE AUX COLLISIONS POUR LES LOCOMOTIVES TRAXX", EB- Elektrische Bahnen, (20040800), XP001201811 | - Wilfried Wolter, Federic B. Carl, Bernhard Bloess, "10 Jahre praktische Nutzung europäischer Forschungsergebnisse zur Kollisionssicherheit von Schienenfahrzeugen Teil I: Von den Anfängen zum aktuellen Beispiel: Bombardier-Lokomotive TRAXX AC3", ZEVrail, (20130303), vol. 137, pages 68 - 76, XP055555166 | - Wilfried Wolter; Federic B Carl; Bernhard Bloess, "10 Jahre praktische Nutzung europäischer Forschungsergebnisse zur Kollisionssicherheit von Schienenfahrzeugen Teil II: Ansätze für wirtschaftliche Crashkonzepte, Betriebserfahrungen und Anregungen für das europäische Regelwerk", ZEVrail, (20130400), pages 116 - 125, XP001582105 | - Wilfried Wolter; Federic B Carl; Bernhard Bloess, "Die Baureihe 185.2 im Spiegel künftiger Anforderungen an die Kollisionssicherheit", EI - Eisenbahningenieur, (20050900), vol. 56, pages 61 - 68, XP055555197 |