EP3111612 - PROFILING FOR MALICIOUS ENCRYPTED NETWORK TRAFFIC IDENTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British Telecommunications public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [2018/01] |
Former [2017/01] | For all designated states British Telecommunications Public Limited Company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EL - MOUSSA, Fadi 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | 02 /
KALLOS, George 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | 03 /
AZVINE, Ben 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [2017/01] | Representative(s) | British Telecommunications public limited company Intellectual Property Department 9th Floor One Braham Braham Street London E1 8EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | British Telecommunications public limited company Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor, Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | ||
Former [2017/01] | Roberts, Scott Anthony BT Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor BT Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 15705373.7 | 16.02.2015 | [2017/01] | WO2015GB50431 | Priority number, date | EP20140250030 | 28.02.2014 Original published format: EP 14250030 | [2017/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015128609 | Date: | 03.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3111612 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3111612 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
H04L63/1416 (EP,US);
H04L63/1408 (EP);
H04L63/1425 (EP,US);
H04L63/1441 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROFILERSTELLUNG FÜR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON BÖSWILLIGEM, VERSCHLÜSSELTEM NETZWERKVERKEHR | [2017/46] | English: | PROFILING FOR MALICIOUS ENCRYPTED NETWORK TRAFFIC IDENTIFICATION | [2017/01] | French: | PROFILAGE POUR L'IDENTIFICATION DE TRAFIC DE RÉSEAU CHIFFRÉ MALVEILLANT | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/01] | PROFILERSTELLUNG FÜR BÖSWILLIG VERSCHLÜSSELTE NETZWERKVERKEHRSIDENTIFIZIERUNG | ||
Former [2017/01] | PROFILAGE D'IDENTIFICATION D'UN TRAFIC DE RÉSEAU CHIFFRÉ MALVEILLANT | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 18.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.02.2015 | AL | 21.03.2018 | AT | 21.03.2018 | CY | 21.03.2018 | CZ | 21.03.2018 | DK | 21.03.2018 | EE | 21.03.2018 | ES | 21.03.2018 | FI | 21.03.2018 | HR | 21.03.2018 | IT | 21.03.2018 | LT | 21.03.2018 | LV | 21.03.2018 | MC | 21.03.2018 | MK | 21.03.2018 | NL | 21.03.2018 | PL | 21.03.2018 | RO | 21.03.2018 | RS | 21.03.2018 | SE | 21.03.2018 | SI | 21.03.2018 | SK | 21.03.2018 | SM | 21.03.2018 | TR | 21.03.2018 | BG | 21.06.2018 | NO | 21.06.2018 | GR | 22.06.2018 | IS | 21.07.2018 | PT | 23.07.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 16.02.2015 | |
AL | 21.03.2018 | ||
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
IS | 21.07.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
IS | 21.07.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2011067106 (EVANS SCOTT CHARLES [US], et al) [Y] 1-29 * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US2012331556 (ALPEROVITCH DMITRI [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026] *; | [A]US2012210421 (ORMAZABAL GASTON S [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0098] *; | [A]US8341724 (BURNS BRYAN [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 17 * * column 11, line 19 - column 15, line 50 *; | [Y] - PATRICK HAFFNER ET AL, "ACAS: Automated Construction of Application Signatures", PROCEEDING OF THE 2005 ACM SIGCOMM WORKSHOP ON MINING NETWORK DATA , MINENET '05, New York, New York, USA, (20050822), doi:10.1145/1080173.1080183, ISBN 978-1-59-593026-2, page 197, XP055130389 [Y] 1-29 * Sections 2 and 4;; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1080173.1080183 | [A] - Peter Dorfinger ET AL, "Entropy Estimation for Real-Time Encrypted Traffic Identification (Short Paper)", Field Programmable Logic and Application, Berlin, Heidelberg, Springer Berlin Heidelberg, (20110427), vol. 6613, pages 164 - 171, doi:10.1007/978-3-642-20305-3_14, ISSN 0302-9743, ISBN 978-3-54-045234-8, XP055127221 [A] 1-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-20305-3_14 | [A] - LAURENT BERNAILLE ET AL, Early Recognition of Encrypted Applications, PASSIVE AND ACTIVE NETWORK MEASUREMENT; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 165 - 175, (20070405), ISBN 978-3-540-71616-7, XP019078570 [A] 1-29 * page 165 - page 171 * |