EP3108474 - ESTIMATING A TEMPO METRIC FROM AN AUDIO BIT-STREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolby International AB Apollo Building, 3E Herikerbergweg 1-35 1101 CN Amsterdam / NL | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BISWAS, Arijit Dolby Germany GmbH Deutschherrnstrasse 15-19 90429 Nuremberg / DE | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe 77 Sir John Rogerson's Quay Block C Grand Canal Docklands Dublin, D02 VK60 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/52] | Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe Apollo Building, 3E Herikerbergweg 1-35 1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | Application number, filing date | 15705597.1 | 18.02.2015 | [2016/52] | WO2015EP53371 | Priority number, date | US201461941283P | 18.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461941283 P | [2016/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015124597 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3108474 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G10H1/00, G10H1/40, G10L19/008 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
G10H1/0008 (EP,US);
G10H1/40 (EP,US);
G10L19/008 (US);
G10L19/167 (US);
G10L25/03 (EP,US);
G10H2210/076 (EP,US);
G10L19/022 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Title | German: | ABSCHÄTZUNG EINER TEMPOMETRIK AUSGEHEND VON EINEM AUDIOBITSTROM | [2018/33] | English: | ESTIMATING A TEMPO METRIC FROM AN AUDIO BIT-STREAM | [2016/52] | French: | ESTIMATION D'UNE MÉTRIQUE DE CADENCE À LA BASE D'UN TRAIN DE BITS AUDIO | [2018/33] |
Former [2016/52] | SCHÄTZUNG EINER TEMPOMETRIK AUS EINEM AUDIOBITSTROM | ||
Former [2016/52] | ESTIMATION D'UNE MESURE DE TEMPO À PARTIR D'UN TRAIN DE BITS AUDIO | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 13.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/27] | 14.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012215546 (BISWAS ARIJIT [DE], et al) [A] 1-38 * para. 1-45; para. 62-147 *; | [A]US2009304204 (BIEBER GERALD [DE], et al) [A] 1-38 * para. 1-4, 15-17, 72-75 *; | [A]US2013282388 (ENGDEGARD JONAS [SE]) [A] 1-38 * para. 1-5, 13, 25, 65 *; | [A]US2012237039 (THESING ROBIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-38 * para. 2-4, 32, 132-133 * |