EP3102194 - BETA-SUBSTITUTED GAMMA-AMINO ACIDS AND ANALOGS AS CHEMOTHERAPEUTIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quadriga Biosciences, Inc. 1111 West El Camino Real Suite 109-234 Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | [2016/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANDELEIT, Bernd 1111 West El Camino Real Suite 109-234 Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | 02 /
FISCHER, Wolf-Nicolas 1111 West El Camino Real Suite 109-234 Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | 03 /
KOLLER, Kerry J. 1111 West El Camino Real Suite 109-234 Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | [2016/50] | Representative(s) | Nieuwenhuys, William Francis Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/50] | Nieuwenhuys, William Francis Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15705866.0 | 03.02.2015 | [2016/50] | WO2015US14299 | Priority number, date | US201461935235P | 03.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461935235 P | [2016/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015117146 | Date: | 06.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3102194 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/197, A61K31/41, A61K31/662, C07C271/46, C07C309/66, C07C229/42, C07D257/04, C07D237/30, C07C239/20, C07C251/04, C07F9/30, A61P35/00 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
A61K31/197 (EP,US);
A61K31/41 (EP,US);
A61K31/662 (EP,US);
A61K47/542 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07C229/08 (US);
C07C229/42 (EP,US);
C07C237/30 (EP,US);
C07C239/18 (EP,US);
C07C239/20 (EP,US);
C07C271/46 (EP,US);
C07C309/69 (EP,US);
C07D257/04 (EP,US);
C07F9/3264 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] | Title | German: | BETA-SUBSTITUIERTE GAMMA-AMINOSÄUREN UND ANALOGA ALS CHEMOTHERAPEUTIKA | [2016/50] | English: | BETA-SUBSTITUTED GAMMA-AMINO ACIDS AND ANALOGS AS CHEMOTHERAPEUTIC AGENTS | [2016/50] | French: | ACIDES GAMMA-AMINÉS BÊTA-SUBSTITUÉS ET ANALOGUES EN TANT QU'AGENTS CHIMIOTHÉRAPEUTIQUES | [2016/50] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/50] | 03.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004054566 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9,12-21,28,31-33,40-43,45,58-61,67,68 * the whole document * * page 18, line 29 - page 19, line 3 * * page 20, lines 3-14 * * page 20, line 24 - page 21, line 20 *; | [X]WO2012011125 (CONNEXIOS LIFE SCIENCES PVT LTD [IN], et al) [X] 1-3,9,12-18,21,22,25,28-30,33,41-43,63-70 * the whole document * * example 93 *; | [X] - DOMKIENE, V. ET AL, "Toxicity and antineoplastic activity of alkylating compounds derived from L-histidine", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1974), Database accession no. 1974:128258, URL: STN, XP002738278 [X] 1-9,16-18,21,22,25-28,40-43,63-70 * abstract * | [X] - DAGIENE, M. ET AL, "Carcinogenic peptides. X. Derivatives of N.alpha.-bis(2-chloroethyl)aminophenylacetyl-L-histidine", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1970:13046, URL: STN, XP002738279 [X] 1-9,16-18,21,22,25-28,40-43,63-66 * abstract * | [X] - DOMKIENE, V. ET AL, "Comparative studies of alkylating peptide like histidine derivatives", HCAPLUS, Database accession no. 1972:483626, URL: STN, XP002738280 [X] 1-9,16-18,21,22,25-28,40-43,63-66 * abstract * | [X] - FENG XU ET AL, "Discovery of a novel potent GABAreceptor agonist", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 21, no. 21, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2011.08.006, ISSN 0960-894X, (20110801), pages 6582 - 6585, (20110817), XP028308820 [X] 1-3,9,12-22,25-30,33,63-68 * the whole document * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2011.08.006 | [A] - PAULAITYTE, N. ET AL, "Development of a spectrophotometric method for the determination of alkylating agents with .gamma.-(4-nitrobenzyl)pyridine", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1974:22450, URL: STN, XP002738281 [A] 1-72 * abstract * | [A] - AGADZHANYAN, TS. E. ET AL, "Biologically active polymers. VI. Synthesis of poly- and copolypeptides containing cytotoxic groups", ARMYANSKII KHIMICHESKII ZHURNAL , 28(8), 662-6 CODEN: AYKZAN; ISSN: 0515-9628, (1975), XP008175885 [A] 1-72 | Examination | - BENAKLI K ET AL, "PREPARATION OF NEW CHLORAMBUCIL ANALOGS BY BIS-SRN1 METHODOLOGY", SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, TAYLOR & FRANCIS INC, PHILADELPHIA, PA; US, (20020101), vol. 32, no. 12, doi:10.1081/SCC-120004080, ISSN 0039-7911, pages 1859 - 1865, XP001114918 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1081/SCC-120004080 | by applicant | US3235594 | US3299104 | DE2731292 | US4339443 | US5015644 | US5602273 | US5602278 | US5959113 | US6313312 | WO02066410 | US6518289 | US6818787 | WO2005110416 | US6972341 | US7109239 | WO2007021937 | US7227028 | WO2008021369 | US2008045534 | WO2008031594 | US7399785 | WO2008117175 | WO2010122089 | US8168617 | US8344028 | - LARAMORE ET AL., CANCER, (1978), vol. 42, no. 1, pages 96 - 103 | - GANAPATHY ET AL., PHARMACOL THER, (2009), vol. 121, no. 1, pages 29 - 40 | - VANDER HEIDEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 324, no. 5930, pages 1029 - 1033 | - BAGGETTO AND BIOCHIMIE, (1992), vol. 74, no. 11, pages 959 - 974 | - MAZUREK; EIGENBRODT, ANTICANCER RES, (2003), vol. 23, no. 2A, pages 1149 - 1154 | - DEBERARDINIS ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2007), vol. 104, no. 49, pages 19345 - 19350 | - CHRISTENSEN, PHYS REV, (1990), vol. 70, pages 43 - 77 | - JAGER ET AL., J NUCL MED, (1998), vol. 39, no. 10, pages 1736 - 1743 | - OHKAME ET AL., J SURG ONCOL, (2001), vol. 78, no. 4, pages 265 - 267 | - TAMAI ET AL., CANCER DETECT PREV, (2001), vol. 25, no. 5, pages 439 - 445 | - KIM ET AL., ANTICANCER RES, (2004), vol. 24, no. 3A, pages 1671 - 1675 | - KOBAYASHI ET AL., NEUROSURGERY, (2008), vol. 62, no. 2, pages 493 - 503 | - IMAI ET AL., HISTOPATHOLOGY, (2009), vol. 54, no. 7, pages 804 - 813 | - KAIRA ET AL., LUNG CANCER, (2009), vol. 66, no. 1, pages 120 - 126 | - NAWASHIRO ET AL., INT J CANC, (2006), vol. 119, no. 3, pages 484 - 492 | - KAIRA ET AL., CANCER SCI, (2008), vol. 99, no. 12, pages 2380 - 2386 | - SAKATA ET AL., PATHOL INT, (2009), vol. 59, no. 1, pages 7 - 18 | - KIM ET AL., BIOL PHARM BULL, (2008), vol. 31, no. 6, pages 1096 - 1100 | - SHENNAN; THOMSON, ONCOL REP, (2008), vol. 20, no. 4, pages 885 - 889 | - KAJI ET AL., INT J GYNECOL CANCER, (2010), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 329 - 336 | - HAASE ET AL., J NUCL MED, (2007), vol. 48, no. 12, pages 2063 - 2071 | - KAIRA ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES, (2007), vol. 13, no. 21, pages 6369 - 6378 | - URAKAMI ET AL., NUCL MED BIOL, (2009), vol. 36, no. 3, pages 295 - 303 | - UCHINO ET AL., MOL PHARMACOL, (2002), vol. 61, no. 4, pages 729 - 737 | - VISTICA, BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (1979), vol. 550, no. 2, pages 309 - 317 | - HOSOYA ET AL., BIOL PHARM BULL, (2008), vol. 31, no. 11, pages 2126 - 2130 | - UCHINO ET AL., MOL PHARM, (2002), vol. 61, no. 4, pages 729 - 737 | - DEL AMO ET AL., EUR J PHARM SCI, (2008), vol. 35, no. 3, pages 161 - 174 | - Science of Synthesis: Houben-Weyl Methods of Moleculer Transformations, THIEME | - HUANG, "New Methods for the Asymmetric Synthesis of Nitrogen Heterocycles", RESEARCH SIGNPOST: TRIVANDRUM, INDIA, (2005), pages 197 - 222 | - SMITH, SMITH, S. WEINREB, ET. AL, Science of Synthesis, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, (2005), vol. 21, pages 647 - 711 | - HUANG, NEW METHODS FOR THE ASYMMETRIC SYNTHESIS OF NITROGEN HETEROCYCLES, (2005), pages 197 - 222 | - ORDNEZ; CATIVIELA, TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (2007), vol. 18, pages 3 - 99 | - M. ORDNEZ ET AL., TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (2010), vol. 21, pages 129 - 147 | - BAYLIS, TETRAHEDRON LETTER, (1995), vol. 36, no. 51, pages 9385 - 9388 | - BURGOS-LEPLEY ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2006), vol. 16, pages 2333 - 2336 | - CARRUTHERS ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT, (1995), vol. 5, pages 237 - 240 | - CARRUTHERS ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT, (1998), vol. 5, pages 3059 - 3064 | - OKAWARA ET AL., CHEM. LETT., (1984), page 2015 | - BALLATORE ET AL., CHEMMEDCHEM, (2013), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 385 - 395 | - PALMER ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1990), vol. 33, no. 1, pages 112 - 121 | - JORDAN ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2002), vol. 10, no. 8, pages 2625 - 2633 | - ABELA MEDICI ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS., (1997), vol. 1, no. 20, pages 2258 - 2263 | - FEAU ET AL., ORG. BIOMOLECULAR CHEM., (2009), vol. 7, no. 24, pages 5259 - 5270 | - SPRINGER ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1990), vol. 33, no. 2, pages 677 - 681 | - TAYLOR ET AL., CHEM. BIOL. DRUG DES., (2007), vol. 70, no. 3, pages 216 - 226 | - BUSS ET AL., J. FLUORINE CHEM., (1986), vol. 34, no. 1, pages 83 - 114 | - LARDEN; CHEUNG, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1996), vol. 37, no. 42, pages 7581 - 7582 | - SPREITZER; PUSCHMANN, MONATSHEFTE FUR CHEMIE, (2007), vol. 138, no. 5, pages 517 - 522 | - NICULESSCU-DUVAZ ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2004), vol. 47, no. 10, pages 2651 - 2658 | - WEISZ ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1995), vol. 5, no. 24, pages 2985 - 2988 | - THORN ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM, (1975), vol. 40, no. 11, pages 1556 - 1558 | - BARALDINI ET AL., J. MED., CHEM., (2000), vol. 53, no. 14, pages 2675 - 2684 | - ZHENG ET AL., BIOORG., MED., CHEM., (2010), vol. 18, no. 2, pages 880 - 886 | - GOURDI ET AL., J., MED., CHEM., (1990), vol. 33, no. 4, pages 1177 - 1186 | - HAINES ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1987), vol. 30, pages 542 - 547 | - MATHARU ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2010), vol. 20, pages 3688 - 3691 | - KUPCZYK-SUBOTKOWSKA ET AL., J. DRUG TARGETING, (1997), vol. 4, no. 6, pages 359 - 370 | - COGGIOLA ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2005), vol. 15, no. 15, pages 3551 - 3554 | - VERNY; NICOLAS, J. LABEL. CMPDS RADIOPHARM., (1988), vol. 25, no. 9, pages 949 - 955 | - LIN, BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2011), vol. 21, no. 3, pages 940 - 943 | - ATWELL ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2007), vol. 50, no. 6, pages 1197 - 1212 | - PALMER ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1994), vol. 37, pages 2175 - 2184 | - PALMER ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1992), vol. 35, no. 17, pages 3214 - 3222 | - PALMER ET AL., J. MED. CHEM, (1990), vol. 33, no. 1, pages 112 - 121 | - DAVIES ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2005), vol. 48, no. 16, pages 5321 - 5328 | - DHEYONGERA ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2005), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 689 - 698 | - LIN ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2011), vol. 21, no. 3, pages 940 - 943 | - FERLIN ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2004), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 771 - 777 | - VINCENT; PRUNET, TETRAHEDRON LETT, (2006), vol. 47, no. 24, pages 4075 - 4077 | - PALMER; DENNY, SYNTH. COMMUN., (1987), vol. 17, no. 5, pages 601 - 610 | - ABELA MEDICI ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS. 1, (1997), vol. 20, pages 2258 - 2263 | - DHEYONGERA, BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2005), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 689 - 698 | - ZHENG, BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2010), vol. 18, no. 2, pages 880 - 886 | - GOURDI, J. MED. CHEM., (1990), vol. 33, no. 4, pages 1177 - 1186 | - SQUIRES ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1975), vol. 40, no. 1, pages 134 - 136 | - VALU ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1990), vol. 33, no. 11, pages 3014 - 3019 | - MATHARU ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT, (2010), vol. 20, pages 3688 - 3691 | - LARDEN; H. T. A. CHEUNG, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1996), vol. 37, no. 42, pages 7581 - 7582 | - PALMER ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1996), vol. 39, no. 13, pages 2518 - 2528 | - THORN, J. ORG. CHEM, (1975), vol. 40, no. 11, pages 1556 - 1558 | - GOURDI ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1990), vol. 33, no. 4, pages 1177 - 1186 | - YANG ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (2007), vol. 63, no. 25, pages 5470 - 5476 | - EMMONS; FERRIS, J AM. CHEM. SOC., (1953), vol. 75, no. 9, page 2257 | - PALANI ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2005), vol. 48, no. 15, pages 4746 - 4749 | - VAN OEVEREN, BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2007), vol. 17, no. 6, pages 1527 - 1531 | - DELFOURNE ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2004), vol. 12, no. 15, pages 3987 - 3994 | - DELFOURNE ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2002), vol. 47, no. 17, pages 3765 - 3771 | - MONTALBETTI; FALQUE, TETRAHEDRON, (2005), vol. 61, pages 10827 - 10852 | - VALEUR; BRADLEY, CHEM. SOC. REV., (2009), vol. 38, pages 606 - 631 | - TAYLOR ET AL., CHEM. BIOL. DRUG DES, (2007), vol. 70, no. 3, pages 216 - 226 | - ABELA ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS. 1, (1997), vol. 20, pages 2258 - 2263 | - ZHENG, BIOORG., MED., CHEM., (2010), vol. 18, no. 2, pages 880 - 886 | - MATHARU ET AL., BIOORG., MED., CHEM., LETT., (2010), vol. 20, pages 3688 - 3691 | - VERNY; NICOLAS, J. LABEL. CMPDS, RADIOPHARM., (1988), vol. 25, no. 9, pages 949 - 955 | - BARALDINI ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2000), vol. 53, no. 14, pages 2675 - 2684 | - LI ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (2006), vol. 71, pages 9045 - 9050 | - WILSON; HAY, NAT. REV. CANE., (2011), vol. 11, pages 393 - 410 | - BROWN; WILSON, NAT. REV. CANE., (2004), vol. 4, pages 437 - 447 | - DENNY ET AL., BR. J. CANE., (1996), vol. 74, no. XXVII, pages S32 - S38 | - NAGASAWA ET AL., BIOL. PHARM. BULL., (2006), vol. 29, no. 12, pages 2335 - 2342 | - KOH ET AL., MOL. CANC. THER., (2008), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 90 - 100 | - KIRKATRICK ET AL., ANTI-CANCER DRUGS, (1994), vol. 5, pages 467 - 472 | - TERCEL ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1995), vol. 38, pages 1247 - 1252 | - CUNDY ET AL., J PHARM EXP THER, (2004), vol. 311, no. 1, pages 315 - 323 | - GRIGAT ET AL., DRUG METABOL DISP, (2009), vol. 37, no. 2, pages 330 - 337 | - MILLER ET AL., J MED CHEM, (1977), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 409 - 413 | - SWEENEY ET AL., CANCER RES, (1978), vol. 38, no. 9, pages 2886 - 2891 | - WEISS; VON HOFF, SEMIN ONCOL, (1985), vol. 12, no. 3, pages 69 - 74 | - SVENSTRUP ET AL., CHEMMEDCHEM, (2008), vol. 3, no. 10, pages 1604 - 1615 | - BLANCHETTE ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1984), vol. 25, pages 2183 - 2186 | - RATHKE; NOVAK, J. ORG. CHEM., (1985), vol. 50, pages 2624 - 2627 | - CLARIDGE ET AL., ORG. LETT., (2008), vol. 10, no. 23, pages 5437 - 5440 | - BRYANS ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1998), vol. 41, pages 1838 - 1845 | - ALTENBACH ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2004), vol. 47, pages 3220 - 3235 | - MARIVET ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1989), vol. 32, pages 1450 - 1457 | - ONO ET AL., SYNTHESIS, (1984), pages 226 - 227 | - BUNCE ET AL., ORG. PRE. PROC. INT., (1987), vol. 19, no. 6, pages 471 - 475 | - CROSBY ET AL., SYNLETT, (2010), pages 539 - 542 | - ROBERTS ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2009), vol. 19, no. 11, pages 3113 - 3117 | - WHITLOCK ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2009), vol. 19, no. 11, pages 3118 - 3121 | - FELDER ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1970), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 559 - 561 | - HAY ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS., (1999), vol. 1, pages 2759 - 2770 | - FUJIKAWA ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2008), vol. 130, pages 14533 - 14543 | - PARIKH ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1967), vol. 89, pages 5505 - 5507 | - AOYAMA ET AL., SYNLETT, (1998), pages 35 - 36 | - COREY; SUGGS, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1975), vol. 16, no. 31, pages 2647 - 2650 | - REETZ ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1986), vol. 42, no. 11, pages 2931 - 2935 | - KULIG ET AL., POL. J. CHEM, (2009), vol. 83, pages 1629 - 1636 | - MANN ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1991), vol. 34, pages 1307 - 1313 | - PEDDI ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM LETT., (2004), vol. 14, pages 2279 - 2283 | - SETAMDIDEH ET AL., ORIENT. J. CHEM., (2011), vol. 27, no. 3, pages 991 - 996 | - MACIEJEWSKI; P. WIPF, ARKIVOC, (2011), vol. VI, pages 92 - 119 | - YANG ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (2013), vol. 69, no. 15, pages 3331 - 3337 | - CADDICK ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (2003), vol. 59, no. 29, pages 5417 - 5423 | - PALMER ET AL., J. MED. CHEM, (1996), vol. 39, no. 13, pages 2518 - 2528 | - METHA, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1992), vol. 33, no. 37, pages 5411 - 5444 | - BEECH, J. CHEM. SOC. (C, (1967), pages 2374 - 2375 | - DAYAL ET AL., STEROIDS, (1990), vol. 55, no. 5, pages 233 - 237 | - VERNY ET AL., CMPDS RADIOPHARM., (1988), vol. 25, no. 9, pages 949 - 955 | - EMMONS; FERRIS, J. AM CHEM. SOC., (1953), vol. 75, no. 9, pages 2257 - 2257 | - EFFENBERGER ET AL., CHEM. BER., (1991), vol. 124, no. 7, pages 1651 - 1659 | - OSBY; GANEM, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1985), vol. 26, no. 52, pages 6413 - 6416 | - LIU ET AL., TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (2001), vol. 12, pages 419 - 426 | - STOWE ET AL., ORG. LETT., (2010), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 756 - 759 | - KRAPCHO, SYNTHESIS, (1982), pages 805 - 822,893-914 | - NEJMAN ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (2005), vol. 61, pages 8536 - 854 | - SULYOK, J. MED. CHEM., (2001), vol. 44, no. 12, pages 1938 - 1950 | - JI ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (2009), vol. 50, no. 45, pages 6166 - 6168 | - HOEKSTRA ET AL., ORG. PROC. DEV. DEV., (1997), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 26 - 38 | - LOUDON ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1984), vol. 49, no. 22, pages 4272 - 4276 | - LOUDON; BOUTIN, J. ORG. CHEM., (1984), vol. 49, no. 22, pages 4277 - 4286 | - NICOLAOU ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (1998), vol. 6, no. 8, pages 1185 - 1208 | - KABALKA; VARMA, ORG. PREP. PROCED. INT., (1987), vol. 19, no. 4-5, pages 283 - 328 | - BAYLIS, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1995), vol. 36, no. 51, pages 9385 - 9388 | - HUFF ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1996), vol. 37, no. 12, pages 3655 - 3658 | - KIRKPATRICK ET AL., ANTI-CANCER DRUGS, (1994), vol. 5, pages 467 - 472 | - KATO ET AL., CANCER RES., (1994), vol. 54, pages 5143 - 5147 |