EP3107739 - SECURITY FEATURE AND USE THEREOF, VALUE DOCUMENT AND PROCESS FOR VERIFYING THE AUTHENTICITY THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 161 81677 München / DE | [2023/10] |
Former [2017/33] | For all designated states Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH Prinzregentenstraße 159 81677 München / DE | ||
Former [2016/52] | For all designated states Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KECHT, Johann Beblostr. 3 81677 München / DE | 02 /
STARK, Martin Breithornstr. 5 81825 München / DE | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Giesecke+Devrient IP Prinzregentenstraße 161 81677 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/22] | Giesecke + Devrient IP Prinzregentenstraße 161 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15706156.5 | 18.02.2015 | [2016/52] | WO2015EP00359 | Priority number, date | DE20141002271 | 19.02.2014 Original published format: DE102014002271 | DE20141016858 | 10.11.2014 Original published format: DE102014016858 | [2016/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015124295 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3107739 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3107739 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/378, B42D25/382, D21H21/48, G07D7/12, G07D7/2033, G07D7/1205 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
G07D7/12 (EP,KR,US);
B42D25/378 (EP,KR,US);
B42D25/21 (US);
B42D25/29 (US);
B42D25/382 (EP,KR,US);
B42D25/387 (US);
D21H21/48 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/6428 (US);
G07D7/1205 (EP,US);
G07D7/2033 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/52] | B42D25/378, B42D25/382, D21H21/48, G07D7/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSMERKMAL UND VERWENDUNG DESSELBEN, WERTDOKUMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR PRÜFUNG DER ECHTHEIT DESSELBEN | [2016/52] | English: | SECURITY FEATURE AND USE THEREOF, VALUE DOCUMENT AND PROCESS FOR VERIFYING THE AUTHENTICITY THEREOF | [2016/52] | French: | SIGNE DE SÉCURITÉ ET SON UTILISATION, DOCUMENT DE VALEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE VÉRIFICATION DE L'AUTHENTICITÉ DE CELUI-CI | [2016/52] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 08.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 31.05.2023 | DK | 31.05.2023 | EE | 31.05.2023 | FI | 31.05.2023 | HR | 31.05.2023 | IT | 31.05.2023 | LT | 31.05.2023 | LV | 31.05.2023 | NL | 31.05.2023 | PL | 31.05.2023 | RO | 31.05.2023 | RS | 31.05.2023 | SE | 31.05.2023 | SI | 31.05.2023 | SK | 31.05.2023 | SM | 31.05.2023 | NO | 31.08.2023 | GR | 01.09.2023 | IS | 30.09.2023 | PT | 02.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | CZ | 31.05.2023 | |
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 31.05.2023 | |
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 31.05.2023 | |
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 31.05.2023 | |
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 31.05.2023 | |
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 31.05.2023 | |
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 31.05.2023 | |
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | PL | 31.05.2023 | |
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 31.05.2023 | |
NO | 31.08.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE102004027416 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,14,15,18-21,24,25 * paragraphs [0031] - [0034] - [0036] , [0038] , [0039]; claim - * [I] 2,6-13,16,17,22,23; | [Y]US2008251581 (FAENZA WILLIAM J [US]) [Y] 1-25 * paragraphs [0063] , [0066] , [0069]; figure - *; | [A]DE102011122240 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0015] *; | [YD]DE102012013244 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-25 * paragraphs [0005] , [0021] , [0022]; figure -; claim - *; | [E]WO2015043760 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-4,6,14-16,18-22,24,25 * figure -; claim - *; | [E]WO2015043761 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-4,6,14-16,18-22,24,25* figure -; claim - * |