EP3107841 - COOLED STORAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autostore Technology AS Stokkastrandvegen 85 5578 Nedre Vats / NO | [2017/24] |
Former [2016/52] | For all designated states Jakob Hatteland Logistics AS Stokkastrandvegen 85 5578 Nedre Vats / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOGNALAND, Ingvar Stokkastrandvegen 334 5578 Nedre Vats / NO | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [2016/52] | Application number, filing date | 15706208.4 | 18.02.2015 | [2016/52] | WO2015EP53390 | Priority number, date | NO20140000216 | 19.02.2014 Original published format: NO 20140216 | [2016/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015124610 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3107841 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3107841 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/02, B65G1/04, F25D13/04 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
F25D13/04 (EP,KR,US);
B65G1/0464 (EP,KR,US);
B65G1/02 (EP,KR,US);
F25D25/04 (US);
F25D19/04 (EP);
F25D2201/10 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/52] | B65G1/04, F25D13/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR GEKÜHLTEN LAGERUNG | [2016/52] | English: | COOLED STORAGE SYSTEM | [2016/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE AU FROID | [2019/44] |
Former [2016/52] | SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE REFROIDI | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 19.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.02.2015 | AL | 22.01.2020 | AT | 22.01.2020 | CY | 22.01.2020 | CZ | 22.01.2020 | EE | 22.01.2020 | FI | 22.01.2020 | HR | 22.01.2020 | LT | 22.01.2020 | LV | 22.01.2020 | MC | 22.01.2020 | MK | 22.01.2020 | MT | 22.01.2020 | RO | 22.01.2020 | RS | 22.01.2020 | SI | 22.01.2020 | SK | 22.01.2020 | SM | 22.01.2020 | TR | 22.01.2020 | IE | 18.02.2020 | LU | 18.02.2020 | BG | 22.04.2020 | NO | 22.04.2020 | GR | 23.04.2020 | IS | 22.05.2020 | PT | 14.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 18.02.2015 | |
AL | 22.01.2020 | ||
AT | 22.01.2020 | ||
CY | 22.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
MT | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IE | 18.02.2020 | ||
LU | 18.02.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 18.02.2015 | |
AT | 22.01.2020 | ||
CY | 22.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
MT | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IE | 18.02.2020 | ||
LU | 18.02.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
IE | 18.02.2020 | ||
LU | 18.02.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
IE | 18.02.2020 | ||
LU | 18.02.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
LU | 18.02.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
LU | 18.02.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
LU | 18.02.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
LU | 18.02.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
NO | 22.04.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO8500422 (FREDRIXON BENNY); | [XDI]US2012272500 (REUTELER BEAT [CH]) | Examination | US4088232 | NO317366B |