EP3114700 - METHODS OF RESOLVING ARTIFACTS IN HADAMARD-TRANSFORMED DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Battelle Memorial Institute PO Box 999 M/S K1-53 Richland, Washington 99352 / US | [2023/38] |
Former [2017/02] | For all designated states Battelle Memorial Institute PO Box 999 M/S K1-53 Richland, Washington 99352 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROWELL, Kevin L. 20 Hilltop Drive Redwood City CA 94062 / US | 02 /
PROST, Spencer A. 2895 Pauling Avenue Apt. 222 Richland, Washington 99354 / US | [2017/04] |
Former [2017/02] | 01 /
CROWELL, Kevin L. 20 Hilltop Drive Redwood City / US | ||
02 /
PROST, Spencer A. 2895 Pauling Avenue Apt. 222 Richland, Washington 99354 / US | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/38] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2017/02] | Stuttard, Garry Philip Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15706659.8 | 18.02.2015 | [2017/02] | WO2015US16419 | Priority number, date | US201414197930 | 05.03.2014 Original published format: US201414197930 | [2017/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015134190 | Date: | 11.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3114700 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3114700 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/00 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
H01J49/0036 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR LÖSUNG VON ARTEFAKTE IN HADAMARD-TRANSFORMIERTEN DATEN | [2023/19] | English: | METHODS OF RESOLVING ARTIFACTS IN HADAMARD-TRANSFORMED DATA | [2017/02] | French: | MÉTHODES DE RÉSOLUTION D'ARTEFACTS DANS DES DONNÉES HADAMARD TRANSFORMÉES | [2023/19] |
Former [2017/02] | VERFAHREN ZUR AUFLÖSUNG VON ARTEFAKTEN IN HADAMARD-TRANSFORMATIONSDATEN | ||
Former [2017/02] | PROCÉDÉS DE RÉSOLUTION D'ARTEFACTS DANS DES DONNÉES AYANT SUBIES UNE TRANSFORMATION DE HADAMARD | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 02.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 20.09.2023 | ES | 20.09.2023 | HR | 20.09.2023 | MC | 20.09.2023 | PL | 20.09.2023 | RO | 20.09.2023 | RS | 20.09.2023 | SK | 20.09.2023 | SM | 20.09.2023 | NO | 20.12.2023 | GR | 21.12.2023 | IS | 20.01.2024 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 20.09.2023 | |
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
PL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 20.09.2023 | |
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 20.09.2023 | |
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 20.09.2023 | |
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 20.12.2023 | |
GR | 21.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004144918 (ZARE RICHARD N [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * paragraphs [0008] , [0035] , [0081] *; | [X]WO2014014559 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [US]) [X] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A] - Richard N Zare ET AL, "High-Speed Mass Spectrometry Hadamard Transform Time-of-Flight Mass Spectrometry: More Signal, More of the Time", (20030101), URL: https://web.stanford.edu/group/Zarelab/publinks/686.pdf, (20150422), XP055185151 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * | [A] - BROCK ANSGAR ET AL, "Characterization of a Hadamard transform time-of-flight mass spectrometer", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20000301), vol. 71, no. 3, doi:10.1063/1.1150456, ISSN 0034-6748, pages 1306 - 1318, XP012038156 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1150456 | by applicant | US7541675 |