EP3108282 - PRODUCTION OF AN OBSERVATION IMAGE OF AN OBJECT REGION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Meditec AG Göschwitzer Strasse 51-52 07745 Jena / DE | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUGER, Christoph Bertha-von-Suttner-Weg 46 73431 Aalen / DE | 02 /
MECKES, Günter Heilmaierstrasse 38 81477 München / DE | [2022/34] |
Former [2016/52] | 01 /
HAUGER, Christoph Bertha von Suttnerweg 46 73431 Aalen / DE | ||
02 /
MECKES, Günter Heilmaierstrasse 38 81477 München / DE | Representative(s) | Gauss, Nikolai, et al Pfiz/Gauss Patentanwälte PartmbB Tübingerstraße 26 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/01] |
Former [2016/52] | Gauss, Nikolai, et al Wolf Pfiz & Gauss Patentanwälte Hauptmannsreute 93 70193 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 15707310.7 | 19.02.2015 | [2016/52] | WO2015EP53552 | Priority number, date | DE201410202996 | 19.02.2014 Original published format: DE102014202996 | DE201410205038 | 18.03.2014 Original published format: DE102014205038 | DE201410207130 | 14.04.2014 Original published format: DE102014207130 | [2016/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015124699 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3108282 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3108282 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/00, G02B21/36, G02B21/22, A61B3/13, H04N5/232, // A61B90/00 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
G02B21/0012 (EP,US);
G02B21/361 (US);
A61B3/13 (EP,US);
A61B90/00 (EP,US);
G02B21/22 (EP,US);
G02B21/365 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/52] | G02B21/00, G02B21/36, G02B21/22, A61B34/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPERATIONSMIKROSKOP UND ERZEUGUNG EINES BEOBACHTUNGSBILDES EINES OBJEKTBEREICHS IN EINEM OPERATIONSMIKROSKOP | [2022/30] | English: | PRODUCTION OF AN OBSERVATION IMAGE OF AN OBJECT REGION | [2016/52] | French: | PRODUCTION D'UNE IMAGE D'OBSERVATION D'UNE ZONE D'UN OBJET | [2016/52] |
Former [2016/52] | ERZEUGEN EINES BEOBACHTUNGSBILDES EINES OBJEKTBEREICHS | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 19.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 04.01.2023 | DK | 04.01.2023 | EE | 04.01.2023 | ES | 04.01.2023 | FI | 04.01.2023 | HR | 04.01.2023 | IT | 04.01.2023 | LT | 04.01.2023 | LV | 04.01.2023 | MC | 04.01.2023 | NL | 04.01.2023 | PL | 04.01.2023 | RO | 04.01.2023 | RS | 04.01.2023 | SE | 04.01.2023 | SI | 04.01.2023 | SK | 04.01.2023 | SM | 04.01.2023 | AT | 19.02.2023 | IE | 19.02.2023 | LU | 19.02.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | FR | 04.03.2023 | GB | 04.04.2023 | NO | 04.04.2023 | GR | 05.04.2023 | IS | 04.05.2023 | PT | 04.05.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SI | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
AT | 19.02.2023 | ||
IE | 19.02.2023 | ||
LU | 19.02.2023 | ||
BE | 28.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
FR | 04.03.2023 | ||
GB | 04.04.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | CZ | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SI | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
IE | 19.02.2023 | ||
LU | 19.02.2023 | ||
BE | 28.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
FR | 04.03.2023 | ||
GB | 04.04.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | CZ | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
IE | 19.02.2023 | ||
LU | 19.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
GB | 04.04.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
LU | 19.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
LU | 19.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | DK | 04.01.2023 | |
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | DK | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 04.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4786155 (FANTONE STEPHEN D [US], et al) [X] 11,12 * figure 3 * * column 1 * * column 5 - column 6 * [Y] 11-14,16; | [A]US5867210 (ROD SAMUEL R [US]) [A] 11-16* figures 1-5 *; | [Y]EP1333305 (ZEISS CARL [DE], et al) [Y] 16 * figures 2-18 * * paragraph [0111] *; | [A]US2004061932 (PENSEL JUERGEN [CH], et al) [A] 1,21 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2005063047 (OBREBSKI ANDREAS [DE], et al) [Y] 11-14 * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0067] *; | [I]EP1887403 (MITAKA KOKI KK [JP]) [I] 11-13 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0048] *; | [XY]DE102007019335 (LEICA MICROSYSTEMS SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [X] 1-4,17,18,20,21 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0061] * [Y] 5-10,19; | [A]WO2009149961 (ZEISS CARL SURGICAL GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,21 * the whole document *; | [I]DE102008024732 (ZEISS CARL SURGICAL GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 11,12 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0072] *; | [Y]DE102009019575 (ZEISS CARL SURGICAL GMBH [DE]) [Y] 5-10,19 * figures 3-10 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005] *; | [IY]DE102010015691 (ZEISS CARL MICROIMAGING GMBH [DE]) [I] 1,3,21 * figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0059] * [Y] 2,4; | [XY]DE102010044502 (LEICA MICROSYSTEMS SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [X] 11-13,15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0072] * * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0087] * [Y] 2,4 | Examination | DE29923951U | DE102008024732 | DE102007019335 | EP1887403 |