EP3107675 - CUTTING TOOL HAVING ADJUSTABLE INSERT CUTTING ANGLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iscar Ltd. P.O. Box 11 24959 Tefen / IL | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASHIN, Alexander 22 Struma Street 22103 Nahariya / IL | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/52] | Application number, filing date | 15707430.3 | 27.01.2015 | [2016/52] | WO2015IL50095 | Priority number, date | US201414184431 | 19.02.2014 Original published format: US201414184431 | [2016/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015125130 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3107675 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3107675 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/10, B23C5/24, B23B51/10 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
B23B51/10 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
B23B35/00 (RU);
B23B27/1696 (KR,US);
B23C3/00 (RU);
B23C5/10 (RU);
B23C5/109 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B23C5/2208 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B23C5/24 (EP,CN,US);
B23C5/2489 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B23B2205/04 (KR,US);
B23B2205/12 (KR,US);
B23B2210/08 (KR,US);
B23B2251/50 (EP,CN,US);
B23B2260/004 (US);
B23C2260/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNEIDWERKZEUG MIT VARIABLEM EINSATZ SCHNEIDWINKEL | [2021/22] | English: | CUTTING TOOL HAVING ADJUSTABLE INSERT CUTTING ANGLE | [2016/52] | French: | OUTIL DE COUPE AYANT ANGLE DE COUPE D'INSERT RÉGLABLE | [2021/22] |
Former [2016/52] | SCHNEIDWERKZEUG MIT VERSTELLBAREM EINSATZSCHNEIDWINKEL | ||
Former [2016/52] | OUTIL DE COUPE AVEC ANGLE DE COUPE DE PLAQUETTE RÉGLABLE | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 27.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.04.2022 | DK | 06.04.2022 | EE | 06.04.2022 | FI | 06.04.2022 | HR | 06.04.2022 | LT | 06.04.2022 | LV | 06.04.2022 | MC | 06.04.2022 | NL | 06.04.2022 | RO | 06.04.2022 | RS | 06.04.2022 | SI | 06.04.2022 | SK | 06.04.2022 | SM | 06.04.2022 | BG | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.07.2022 | GR | 07.07.2022 | IS | 06.08.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/25] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | DK | 06.04.2022 | |
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | DK | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | FI | 06.04.2022 | |
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 06.04.2022 | |
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 06.04.2022 | |
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 06.04.2022 | |
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 06.04.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0282090 (ENTWICKLUNGSZENT ZERSPANTECH [DE]) [X] 1,28 * column 7, line 39 - column 12, line 11 * * figures 1-6 * [I] 2-27,29-31; | [XI]DE4436779 (AUDI AG [DE]) [X] 1,28 * column 1, line 51 - column 3, line 15 * * figures 1,2 * [I] 2-27,29-31; | [A]DE19635490 (OEHLER MASCHBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,28 * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 30 * * figures 1-4 *; | [AD]US5913643 (FOWLER JEREMY L [US], et al) [AD] 1,28* the whole document *; | [XI]US2012251252 (ACHARYA GURUCHARAN [IN]) [X] 1,28 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0055] * * figures 1-12 * [I] 2-27,29-31 | by applicant | DE4419668 | US5913643 |