EP3107449 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR FILTERING AUTOCORRELATION PEAKS AND DETECTING HARMONICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OCHS, James 1261 Clark Way Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | 02 /
MCGONIGLE, Scott 3319 Carnbee Avenue Edinburgh EH16 6GA / GB | 03 /
ADDISON, Paul 30 Queen Margaret Close Edinburgh EH10 7EE / GB | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Hargreaves, Timothy Edward Marks & Clerk LLP Atholl Exchange 6 Canning Street Edinburgh EH3 8EG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/52] | Hargreaves, Timothy Edward Marks & Clerk LLP Atholl Exchange 6 Canning Street Edinburgh EH3 8EG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15707515.1 | 20.02.2015 | [2016/52] | WO2015US16924 | Priority number, date | US201461942564P | 20.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461942564 P | [2016/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015127281 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3107449 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/08, A61B5/00, A61B5/1455 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
A61B5/7246 (EP,US);
A61B5/02416 (EP,US);
A61B5/0816 (EP,US);
A61B5/14551 (EP,US);
A61B5/7203 (EP,US);
A61B5/7278 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR FILTERUNG VON AUTOKORRELATIONSSPITZEN UND DETEKTION VON OBERWELLEN | [2016/52] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR FILTERING AUTOCORRELATION PEAKS AND DETECTING HARMONICS | [2016/52] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE FILTRATION DE PICS D'AUTO-CORRÉLATION ET DE DÉTECTION D'HARMONIQUES | [2016/52] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 07.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 27.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2013079606 (MCGONIGLE SCOTT [GB], et al) [X] 1,3-11,13-20 * paragraphs [0146] - [0148] - [0151] - [0154] - [0168] , [0169] , [0171] - [0176] - [0179] - [0184] * * paragraphs [0199] - [0205] - [0208] - [0210] * * figures 19,20,22A,22B,23,28-31 * [I] 2,12; | [X]US2013137936 (BAKER JR CLARK R [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-16,18-20 * paragraphs [0011] , [0050] , [0059] , [0060] , [0062] , [0063] , [0066] - [0076] * * figures 4-6 * * claim 10 *; | [A]US2013172767 (DRIPPS JAMES [GB], et al) [A] 1,11 * claims 1,3 * * figure 5 * * paragraphs [0067] , [0076] *; | [A]US2013289413 (OCHS JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * figures 2,4,5,9 ** paragraphs [0015] , [0071] , [0081] , [0086] * |