EP3137400 - INTERMEDIATE HOLDING FACILITY FOR PICKING STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ocado Innovation Limited The IP Department c/o Buildings One & Two Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/26] | For all designated states Ocado Innovation Limited The IP Department c/o Buildings One & Two Trident Place, Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | ||
Former [2018/08] | For all designated states Ocado Innovation Limited 1 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield, HERTS AL10 9UL / GB | ||
Former [2017/10] | For all designated states Ocado Innovation Limited Titan Court 3 Bishops Square Hatfield Business Park Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDBO, Lars Sverker Ture Ocado Innovation Limited Titan Court 3 Bishops Square Hatfield Business Park Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | 02 /
STADIE, Robert Rolf Ocado Innovation Limited Titan Court 3 Bishops Square Hatfield Business Park Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | 03 /
CLARKE, Paul Ocado Innovation Limited Titan Court 3 Bishops Square Hatfield Business Park Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | [2017/10] | Representative(s) | Ocado Group IP Department Office One Ridgecombe Barn Lifton Devon PL16 OHD / GB | [2024/41] |
Former [2017/10] | Wojcik, Lucy Eleanor c/o Impetus IP Limited Suite 31 West Devon Business Park Brook Lane Tavistock, PL19 9DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 15707563.1 | 10.02.2015 | [2017/10] | WO2015EP52774 | Priority number, date | GB20140002263 | 10.02.2014 Original published format: GB 201402263 | [2017/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015118171 | Date: | 13.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3137400 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3137400 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B65G61/00, B65G1/137 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
B65G1/1378 (EP,KR,US);
B65G61/00 (EP,KR,US);
B65G1/137 (GB);
B65G1/1373 (GB,US);
B65G47/90 (KR);
B65G2201/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZWISCHENPRODUKTHALTEANLAGE FÜR KOMMISIONIERSTATION | [2017/10] | English: | INTERMEDIATE HOLDING FACILITY FOR PICKING STATION | [2017/10] | French: | INSTALLATION DE STOCKAGE INTERMÉDIAIRE POUR POSTE DE PRÉPARATION DE COMMANDES | [2017/10] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/10] | 14.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 14.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2021 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 10.03.2021 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 28.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.01.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 21.01.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.01.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 29.01.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.03.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 14.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 14.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.02.2017 | Decision despatched | 14.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 14.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.02.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 14.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 14.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.02.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 14.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 14.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.02.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2008067964 (KUKA ROBOTER GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]WO2010022832 (SSI SCHAEFER PEEM GMBH [AT], et al); | [Y]EP2520524 (OPM S P A [IT]); | [XA]DE102011053547 (APOLOGISTICS GMBH [DE]); | [XAI]US2013110280 (FOLK MICHAEL [DE]); | [XAY]EP2650237 (VANDERLANDE IND BV [NL]); | [XP]US2014244026 (NEISER RAYMOND R [US]) |