EP3108611 - PHYSICAL UNCLONEABLE FUNCTION BASED ANTI-COUNTERFEITING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The European Union, represented by the European Commission 1049 Brussels / BE | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALDINI, Gianmarco Via Primo Maggio 48 Interno 8 Ispra I-21027 Varese / IT | 02 /
SANCHEZ MARTIN, Jose Ignacio Via Besana 201 Ispra I-21027 Varese / IT | 03 /
NAI FOVINO, Igor Via Dolomiti 1 21040 Castronno / IT | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Gevers Patents De Kleetlaan 7A 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/31] | Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [2016/52] | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 15707581.3 | 20.02.2015 | [2016/52] | WO2015EP53667 | Priority number, date | EP20140156230 | 21.02.2014 Original published format: EP 14156230 | [2016/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015124752 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3108611 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3108611 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32, G09C1/00 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
H04L9/3278 (EP);
G09C1/00 (EP);
H04L2209/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHYSIKALISCH UNKLONBARES FUNKTIONSBASIERTES FÄLSCHUNGSSCHUTZSYSTEM | [2018/11] | English: | PHYSICAL UNCLONEABLE FUNCTION BASED ANTI-COUNTERFEITING SYSTEM | [2016/52] | French: | SYSTÈME ANTI-CONTREFAÇON BASÉ SUR UNE FONCTION PHYSIQUE QUI NE PEUT PAS ÊTRE CLONÉE | [2018/11] |
Former [2016/52] | FÄLSCHUNGSSCHUTZSYSTEM AUF BASIS EINER PHYSIKALISCHEN UNKLONBAREN FUNKTION | ||
Former [2016/52] | SYSTÈME ANTI-CONTREFAÇON BASÉ SUR UNE FONCTION PHYSIQUE NON CLONABLE | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 12.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.02.2015 | AL | 01.08.2018 | AT | 01.08.2018 | CY | 01.08.2018 | CZ | 01.08.2018 | DK | 01.08.2018 | EE | 01.08.2018 | ES | 01.08.2018 | FI | 01.08.2018 | HR | 01.08.2018 | LT | 01.08.2018 | LV | 01.08.2018 | MC | 01.08.2018 | MK | 01.08.2018 | NL | 01.08.2018 | RO | 01.08.2018 | RS | 01.08.2018 | SE | 01.08.2018 | SI | 01.08.2018 | SK | 01.08.2018 | SM | 01.08.2018 | TR | 01.08.2018 | BG | 01.11.2018 | NO | 01.11.2018 | IS | 01.12.2018 | PT | 01.12.2018 | IE | 20.02.2019 | LU | 20.02.2019 | MT | 20.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | FR | 28.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 20.02.2015 | |
AL | 01.08.2018 | ||
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CY | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.02.2019 | ||
LU | 20.02.2019 | ||
MT | 20.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CY | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.02.2019 | ||
LU | 20.02.2019 | ||
MT | 20.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.02.2019 | ||
LU | 20.02.2019 | ||
MT | 20.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.02.2019 | ||
LU | 20.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.02.2019 | ||
LU | 20.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
IE | 20.02.2019 | ||
LU | 20.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 01.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2007031908 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 7, line 33 - page 11, line 15 * * figures 2,3,5,6 *; | [YA]WO2008068644 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 8,9,12-15 * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 27 * * page 7, line 28 - page 9, line 2 * * page 12, line 8 - line 15 * * page 15, line 16 - page 18, line 24 * * pages 23,24 * * figure 1 * [A] 1-7,10,11; | [A]WO2008152564 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 7, line 1 - page 9, line 28 *; | [Y] - KATZENBEISSER STEFAN ET AL ABDELZAHER TAREK ZAHERIOTALLINOIS EDU UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS AT URBANA CHAMPAIGN DEPARTMENT OF COMPUTER, Recyclable PUFs: Logically Reconfigurable PUFs, ADVANCES IN COMMUNICATION NETWORKING : 20TH EUNICE/IFIP EG 6.2, 6.6 INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP, RENNES, FRANCE, SEPTEMBER 1-5, 2014, REVISED SELECTED PAPERS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE , ISSN 1611-3349], SPRINGER VERLAG, DE, PAGE(S) 374 - 389, (20110928), ISSN 0302-9743, XP047303336 [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0007] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-23951-9_25 | [Y] - YINGJIE LAO ET AL, "Reconfigurable architectures for silicon Physical Unclonable Functions", ELECTRO/INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY (EIT), 2011 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20110515), doi:10.1109/EIT.2011.5978614, ISBN 978-1-61284-465-7, pages 1 - 7, XP032009623 [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/EIT.2011.5978614 | [A] - JENG A B ET AL, "Survey and remedy of the technologies used for RFID tags against counterfeiting", MACHINE LEARNING AND CYBERNETICS, 2009 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090712), ISBN 978-1-4244-3702-3, pages 2975 - 2981, XP031518171 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] * |