EP3111395 - PORTABLE BIOMETRIC-BASED IDENTITY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hanscan IP B.V. Dorpsstraat 21 1191 BH Ouderkerk aaan de Amstel / NL | [2017/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZWART, Klaas Hanscan IP B.V. Dorpsstraat 21 NL-1191 BH Ouderkerk aaan de Amstel / NL | 02 /
ANTEQUERA RODRIGUEZ, Nicolas Hanscan IP B.V. Dorpsstraat 21 NL-1191 BH Ouderkerk aaan de Amstel / NL | [2017/01] | Representative(s) | Rankin, Douglas Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/01] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 15707895.7 | 23.02.2015 | [2017/01] | WO2015EP53740 | Priority number, date | ES20140030247 | 24.02.2014 Original published format: ES 201430247 | [2017/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015124770 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3111395 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/32, G06F21/35 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
G06F21/32 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q20/3226 (EP,KR,US);
G06F21/35 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q20/3829 (KR);
G06Q20/40145 (EP,KR);
G06V40/45 (US);
G07C9/257 (EP,US);
G07C9/26 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (US);
H04L63/0861 (EP,KR,US);
H04L63/0892 (EP,KR,US);
H04L9/0869 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] | Title | German: | TRAGBARES BIOMETRISCHE IDENTITÄTSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/01] | English: | PORTABLE BIOMETRIC-BASED IDENTITY DEVICE | [2017/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IDENTITÉ PORTABLE À BASE BIOMÉTRIQUE | [2017/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 30.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 29.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/34] | 15.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/34] | 02.04.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 29.08.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 29.08.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.09.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004064728 (SCHEURICH CHRISTOPH E [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]EP2362179 (HANSCAN IP BV [NL]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [XDI]EP2512061 (HANSCAN IP BV [NL]) [XD] 1-5,9,11,14 * the whole document * [I] 6-8,10,12,13,15; | [A]US2013076482 (WAN WAH TONG THOMAS [SG]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |