EP3116879 - IMIDAZOPYRIMIDINE MACROCYCLES AS INHIBITORS OF HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS REPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIIV Healthcare UK (No.5) Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2017/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAIDU, B. Narasimhulu c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 02 /
PATEL, Manoj c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway llingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | [2017/03] | Representative(s) | Learoyd, Stephanie Anne GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2017/03] | Application number, filing date | 15708065.6 | 13.02.2015 | [2017/03] | WO2015US15895 | Priority number, date | US201461940912P | 18.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461940912 P | [2017/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015126758 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3116879 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07D498/22, A61K31/529, A61P31/18 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
C07D498/22 (EP,US);
A61K31/529 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P31/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] | Extension states | BA | 13.09.2016 | ME | 13.09.2016 | Title | German: | IMIDAZOPYRIMIDIN-MAKROCYCLEN ALS INHIBITOREN DER REPLIKATION DES MENSCHLICHEN IMMUNSCHWÄCHEVIRUS | [2017/03] | English: | IMIDAZOPYRIMIDINE MACROCYCLES AS INHIBITORS OF HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS REPLICATION | [2017/03] | French: | MACROCYCLES D'IMIDAZOPYRIMIDINE UTILISÉS COMME INHIBITEURS DE LA RÉPLICATION DU VIRUS DE L'IMMUNODÉFICIENCE HUMAINE | [2017/03] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/03] | 13.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/31] | 26.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2012065963 (UNIV LEUVEN KATH [BE], et al); | [AD]US2013231331 (PENDRI ANNAPURNA [US], et al); | [IDP]US2014051692 (NAIDU B NARASIMHULU [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2007131350 | WO2009062285 | WO2009062288 | WO2009062289 | WO2009062308 | WO2010130842 | WO2011076765 | WO2012003497 | WO2012003498 | WO2012033735 | WO2012065963 | WO2012066442 | WO2013012649 | WO2013043553 | WO2013062028 | WO2013073875 | WO2013134113 | WO2013134142 | WO2014021867 | WO2014028384 | WO2014164428 |