EP3129667 - BEARING ARRANGEMENT WITH CAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2017/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANG, Johannes Lohbeet 13 91097 Oberreichenbach / DE | 02 /
STARK, Alexander Lagerweg 2 97500 Ebelsbach / DE | 03 /
ANGER, Andre Parkstraße 14 91486 Uehlfeld / DE | [2017/07] | Application number, filing date | 15708712.3 | 30.01.2015 | [2017/07] | WO2015DE200053 | Priority number, date | DE201410206804 | 09.04.2014 Original published format: DE102014206804 | [2017/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015154760 | Date: | 15.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3129667 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/50, F16C33/50, F16C43/08 | [2017/07] | CPC: |
F16C19/502 (EP,CN);
F16C43/083 (EP,CN);
F16C33/4652 (EP);
F16C33/504 (CN);
F16C41/04 (EP);
F16C2361/45 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/07] | Title | German: | LAGERANORDNUNG MIT EINEM KÄFIG | [2017/07] | English: | BEARING ARRANGEMENT WITH CAGE | [2017/07] | French: | ENSEMBLE PALIER AVEC CAGE | [2017/07] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/07] | 24.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/04] | 19.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | Examination | FR2307177 | DE102005054082 |