EP3102141 - A SYSTEM FOR VISUALISING AN ANATOMICAL TARGET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/50] | VISUALIZATION OF DEPTH AND POSITION OF BLOOD VESSELS AND ROBOT GUIDED VISUALIZATION OF BLOOD VESSEL CROSS SECTION | ||
[2019/13] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2022 | New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2016/50] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POPOVIC, Aleksandra c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
ELHAWARY, Haytham c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/50] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/50] | Steffen, Thomas Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 15708884.0 | 26.01.2015 | [2016/50] | WO2015IB50551 | Priority number, date | US201461935643P | 04.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461935643 P | [2016/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015118423 | Date: | 13.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3102141 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3102141 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B90/00, A61B34/20 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
A61B90/37 (EP,US);
A61B1/00009 (US);
A61B1/000094 (EP,US);
A61B1/00165 (US);
A61B1/00194 (EP,US);
A61B34/10 (US);
A61B90/361 (US);
A61B2017/00243 (EP,US);
A61B2034/107 (EP,US);
A61B2034/301 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3614 (EP,US);
A61B2090/365 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIN SYSTEM ZUR VISUALISIERUNG EINES ANATOMISCHEN ZIELS | [2019/13] | English: | A SYSTEM FOR VISUALISING AN ANATOMICAL TARGET | [2019/13] | French: | UN SYSTÈME DE VISUALISATION D'UNE CIBLE ANATOMIQUE | [2019/13] |
Former [2016/50] | VISUALISIERUNG DER TIEFE UND POSITION VON BLUTGEFÄSSEN UND ROBOTERGEFÜHRTE VISUALISIERUNG EINES BLUTGEFÄSSQUERSCHNITTS | ||
Former [2016/50] | VISUALIZATION OF DEPTH AND POSITION OF BLOOD VESSELS AND ROBOT GUIDED VISUALIZATION OF BLOOD VESSEL CROSS SECTION | ||
Former [2016/50] | VISUALISATION DE LA PROFONDEUR ET DE LA POSITION DE VAISSEAUX SANGUINS ET VISUALISATION GUIDÉE PAR UN ROBOT DE LA SECTION TRANSVERSALE DE VAISSEAUX SANGUINS | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/50] | 15.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.05.2020
ADMISSIBLE Brainlab AG Olof-Palme-Str. 9 81829 München / DE Opponent's representative SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2020/25] | 18.06.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.10.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.03.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.03.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 02.06.2022 | Appeal received No. T1252/22 | 02.06.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 02.08.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.05.2022 | Appeal received No. T1252/22 | 19.05.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 25.07.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.01.2015 | AL | 14.08.2019 | AT | 14.08.2019 | CY | 14.08.2019 | CZ | 14.08.2019 | DK | 14.08.2019 | EE | 14.08.2019 | ES | 14.08.2019 | FI | 14.08.2019 | HR | 14.08.2019 | IT | 14.08.2019 | LT | 14.08.2019 | LV | 14.08.2019 | MC | 14.08.2019 | MK | 14.08.2019 | MT | 14.08.2019 | NL | 14.08.2019 | PL | 14.08.2019 | RO | 14.08.2019 | RS | 14.08.2019 | SE | 14.08.2019 | SI | 14.08.2019 | SK | 14.08.2019 | SM | 14.08.2019 | TR | 14.08.2019 | BG | 14.11.2019 | NO | 14.11.2019 | GR | 15.11.2019 | IS | 14.12.2019 | PT | 16.12.2019 | IE | 26.01.2020 | LU | 26.01.2020 | BE | 31.01.2020 | CH | 31.01.2020 | LI | 31.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 26.01.2015 | |
AL | 14.08.2019 | ||
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CY | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
MT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IE | 26.01.2020 | ||
LU | 26.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IE | 26.01.2020 | ||
LU | 26.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
LU | 26.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
LU | 26.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 14.08.2019 | |
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 14.08.2019 | |
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 14.08.2019 | |
NO | 14.11.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO2012172474 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,16,17 * the whole document * [A] 20,21[I] 3,5,6,18,19 | Opposition | WO2008095068 | WO2012035492 | WO2012172474 | - SATOKI ZENBUTSU et al., "3D Ultrasound Assisted Laparoscopic Liver Surgery by Visualization of Blood Vessels", 2013 Joint UFFC, EFTF and PFM Symposium, (20130000), pages 840 - 843, XP55739309 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ULTSYM.2013.0216 | - Satoki Zenbutsu, Et Al, "Development of Blood Vessel Depth Displaying Method for Laparoscopic Surgery Guidance", Journal of Medical Imaging and Health Informatics, (20130301), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 101 - 106, XP055739317 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1166/jmihi.2013.1134 | - Christian Hansen, Jan Wieferich, Felix Ritter, Christian Rieder, Heinz-Otto Peitgen, "Illustrative visualization of 3D planning models for augmented reality in liver surgery", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER ASSISTED RADIOLOGY AND SURGERY, SPRINGER, DE, DE, (20100301), vol. 5, no. 2, doi:10.1007/s11548-009-0365-3, ISSN 1861-6410, pages 133 - 141, XP055739322 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11548-009-0365-3 | - C Hansen, Et Al, "Illustration of Vascular Structures for Augmented Reality in Liver Surgery", IFMBE PROCEEDINGS, (20090101), vol. 25, no. 4, pages 2113 - 2113, XP055739327 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-03882-2_561 | - "vectorVision cranial/ENT version 7.8", Clinical User Guide revision 1.2, (20080000), pages 1 - 594 | - CHRISTIAN WINNE et al., "Overlay Visualization in Endoscopic ENT Surgery", International Journal of Computer Assisted Radiology and Surgery, (20110000), vol. 6, doi:10.1007/s11548-010-0507-7, pages 401 - 406, XP055192893 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11548-010-0507-7 | - MATTEO FUSAGLIA et al., "Endoscopic Image Overlay for the Targeting of Hidden Anatomy in Laparoscopic Visceral Surgery", Augmented Environments for Computer-Assisted Interventions, Lecture Notes in Computer Science, (20130000), vol. 7815, doi:10.1007/978-3-642-38085-3_3, pages 9 - 21, XP055563296 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-38085-3_3 | - Nobuyuki Hirai, Et Al, "Image-guided neurosurgery system integrating AR-based navigation and open-MRI monitoring", COMPUTER AIDED SURGERY, TAYLOR & FRANCIS INC., PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, US, (20050101), vol. 10, no. 2, doi:10.3109/10929080500229389, ISSN 1092-9088, pages 59 - 72, XP055739333 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/10929080500229389 | - XIAOCHUAN SUN, "IMAGE GUIDED INTERACTION IN MINIMALLY INVASIVE SURGERY", Master Thesis, (20120000), pages 1 - 140 | - SEBASTIAN VOGT, "Real-Time Augmented Reality for Image-Guided Interventions", Doctor-thesis, (20090000), pages 1 - 212 |