EP3111461 - IMPROVED MICRO-SOLENOID CONTACT-BREAKER FOR MOTOR VEHICLE STARTER, AND CORRESPONDING STARTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.2019 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Equipements Electriques Moteur 2, rue André Boulle 94046 Créteil Cedex / FR | [2017/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
METRAL, Jean Sébastien 93 rue Hector Berlioz 38290 La Verpilliere / FR | 02 /
GUESNEY, Tristan 99 Avenue Lacassagne 69003 Lyon / FR | [2017/01] | Representative(s) | Vaufleury, Guillaume Valeo Equipements Electriques Moteur Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle 94046 Créteil Cedex / FR | [2017/01] | Application number, filing date | 15709283.4 | 19.02.2015 | [2017/01] | WO2015FR50408 | Priority number, date | FR20140051567 | 27.02.2014 Original published format: FR 1451567 | [2017/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015128564 | Date: | 03.09.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3111461 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01H51/06 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
H01H51/065 (EP,US);
H01H50/54 (CN);
H01H47/22 (US);
H01H50/18 (CN);
H01H50/20 (US);
H01H50/30 (CN);
H01H50/42 (US);
H01H2235/01 (US);
H01H3/60 (EP,US);
H01H47/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER MIKROSOLENOIDSCHUTZSCHALTER FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGANLASSER UND ENTSPRECHENDER ANLASSER | [2017/01] | English: | IMPROVED MICRO-SOLENOID CONTACT-BREAKER FOR MOTOR VEHICLE STARTER, AND CORRESPONDING STARTER | [2017/01] | French: | CONTACTEUR A MICRO-SOLENOÏDE PERFECTIONNE POUR DEMARREUR DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE ET DEMARREUR CORRESPONDANT | [2017/01] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 15.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/38] | 02.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2013093365 (VALEO EQUIP ELECTR MOTEUR [FR]) [X] 1,2,5-8,14 * page 15, lines 6-30; figures 1-5,11 * [I] 3,4,9-13; | [A]EP2385538 (VALEO EQUIP ELECTR MOTEUR [FR]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0017] - [0071]; figure - *; | [A]EP2385539 (VALEO EQUIP ELECTR MOTEUR [FR]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0016] - [0070]; figure - * | by applicant | FR2795884 | FR2923869 | FR2959891 |