EP3108223 - ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JT International SA 8 rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Geneva / CH | [2023/17] |
Former [2016/52] | For all designated states JT International SA 8 rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Geneva / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOUVEAU, Eric 28bis Avenue Gaston Bourgeois F-06600 Antibes / FR | 02 /
MALCAVET, Didier Mas de Brun Residence George Hugues 407 Route de Pierrefeu F-83390 Puget-Ville / FR | 03 /
ANAVI, Steve 54 rue Notre Dame de Lorette F-75009 Paris / FR | 04 /
PROT, Alexandre 42 rue Etienne Marcel F-75002 Paris / FR | [2023/17] |
Former [2016/52] | 01 /
LOUVEAU, Eric 28bis Avenue Gaston Bourgeois F-06600 Antibes / FR | ||
02 /
MALCAVET, Didier 9 Passage du Lido Résidence San Marco - C12 F-06800 Cagnes-sur-Mer / FR | |||
03 /
ANAVI, Steve 13 Rue de Montmorency F-75003 Paris / FR | |||
04 /
PROT, Alexandre 12 Rue Dupetit-Thouars F-75003 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2023/17] |
Former [2016/52] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15709290.9 | 20.02.2015 | [2016/52] | WO2015FR50416 | Priority number, date | FR20140051409 | 21.02.2014 Original published format: FR 1451409 | [2016/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015124878 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3108223 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3108223 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/18, A24F40/50 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
A24F40/50 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A24F47/00 (EA);
G01N27/18 (EP,EA,KR,US);
H05B1/0208 (EA,KR,US);
H05B2203/035 (EA,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/52] | G01N27/18, A24F47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE ZIGARETTE | [2016/52] | English: | ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE | [2016/52] | French: | CIGARETTE ELECTRONIQUE | [2016/52] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 21.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 17.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22306036.9 / EP4104691 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/14] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 17.03.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 17.03.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.03.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.04.2023 | CZ | 26.04.2023 | DK | 26.04.2023 | EE | 26.04.2023 | ES | 26.04.2023 | FI | 26.04.2023 | HR | 26.04.2023 | IT | 26.04.2023 | LT | 26.04.2023 | LV | 26.04.2023 | MC | 26.04.2023 | NL | 26.04.2023 | PL | 26.04.2023 | RO | 26.04.2023 | RS | 26.04.2023 | SE | 26.04.2023 | SI | 26.04.2023 | SK | 26.04.2023 | SM | 26.04.2023 | NO | 26.07.2023 | GR | 27.07.2023 | IS | 26.08.2023 | PT | 28.08.2023 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 26.04.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0430566 (PHILIP MORRIS [US]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-10 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 53 * * column 5, line 31 - line 39 * * column 14, line 28 - line 58 *; | [A]US6040560 (FLEISCHHAUER GRIER S [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-19 * * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 38 * * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 11 ** column 9, line 38 - column 10, line 34 *; | [XA]EP2143346 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [X] 1,2,5-7,10 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0007] , [0025] , [0069] * [A] 3,4,8,9; | [XA]EP2468116 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * figures 1-9 * * paragraphs [0045] , [0046] , [0069] , [0075] , [0080] , [0081] * [A] 4-6,9,10; | [A]WO2013060781 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 20; figures 1-5 * * page 17, line 1 - page 18, line 4 *; | [A]WO2013098398 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-6 * * page 8, line 5 - page 10, line 2 * * page 17, line 1 - page 18, line 4 * | by applicant | EP2143346 | EP2468116 |