EP3113892 - TOOL SLIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states voestalpine Camtec GmbH voestalpine-Str. 3 4020 Linz / AT | [2020/19] |
Former [2018/31] | For all designated states voestalpine Camtec GmbH voestalpine-Str. 3 4020 Linz / AT | ||
Former [2017/02] | For all designated states Voestalpine Giesserei Linz GmbH Voestalpine-Str. 3 4020 Linz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYER, Markus Michael-Grimm-Weg 2 88239 Wangen im Allgäu / DE | [2017/02] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Europe LLP Neumarkter Straße 18 81673 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/19] | HGF Europe LLP Neumarkter Str. 18 81673 München / DE | ||
Former [2017/02] | Patronus IP Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neumarkter Strasse 18 81673 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15709660.3 | 05.03.2015 | [2017/02] | WO2015EP54662 | Priority number, date | DE201410102993 | 06.03.2014 Original published format: DE102014102993 | [2017/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015132355 | Date: | 11.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3113892 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3113892 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B21D28/32, B30B1/40 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
B21D28/325 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B21D28/32 (US);
B21D37/14 (US);
B30B1/40 (EP,KR);
B30B15/026 (EP,CN,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WERKZEUGSCHIEBER | [2017/02] | English: | TOOL SLIDE | [2017/02] | French: | COULISSEAU PORTE-OUTIL | [2017/02] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 02.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.03.2015 | AL | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | DK | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | ES | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | IT | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | NL | 06.05.2020 | PL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | RS | 06.05.2020 | SE | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | SM | 06.05.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | NO | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | IS | 06.09.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 05.03.2015 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0983808 (OILES INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,5 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0027]; figure - * [I] 2,4,6-10; | [XI]DE10340509 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032]; figures 7,8 * [I] 6-10; | [XI]WO2009039895 (WEIGELT HARALD [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract *[I] 3,6-10 | by applicant | DE2329324 | DE2439217 | DE2640318 | US5101705 | DE19753549 | EP1197319 | DE102007045703 | DE102012014546 |