EP3108411 - PHASE-CODING FOR COORDINATE TRANSFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAO, Naveen Gandham 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/52] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15710309.4 | 12.02.2015 | [2016/52] | WO2015US15695 | Priority number, date | US201461942557P | 20.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461942557 P | US201414226696 | 26.03.2014 Original published format: US201414226696 | [2016/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015126731 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3108411 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
G06N3/049 (EP,KR,US);
G06N3/02 (KR);
G06F11/08 (US);
G06F17/17 (US);
G06N3/04 (US);
G16H50/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Title | German: | PHASENCODIERUNG FÜR KOORDINATENTRANSFORMATION | [2016/52] | English: | PHASE-CODING FOR COORDINATE TRANSFORMATION | [2016/52] | French: | CODAGE DE PHASE POUR UNE TRANSFORMATION DE COORDONNÉES | [2016/52] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 29.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/31] | 19.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA]US2013204819 (HUNZINGER JASON FRANK [US], et al) [I] 1,7,8,10,16,17,19,20 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0292] * [A] 2-6,9,11-15,18; | [XI] - QINGXIANG WU ET AL, Adaptive Co-ordinate Transformation Based on a Spike Timing-Dependent Plasticity Learning Paradigm, ADVANCES IN NATURAL COMPUTATION; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS], SPRINGER-VERLAG, BERLIN/HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 420 - 428, (20050723), ISBN 978-3-540-28323-2, XP019014013 [X] 1,7,8,16,17,19,20 * page 420 - page 426 * [I] 2-6,9-15,18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/11539087_54 | [I] - TOURETZKY D S ET AL, "NEURAL REPRESENTATION OF SPACE USING SINUSOIDAL ARRAYS", NEURAL COMPUTATION, MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, US, (19931101), vol. 5, no. 6, ISSN 0899-7667, pages 869 - 884, XP008058867 [I] 1-20 * page 869 - page 882, paragraph 4 * | [IA] - LEI ZHANG ET AL, "Configurable Neural Phase Shifter With Spike-Timing-Dependent Plasticity", IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20100701), vol. 31, no. 7, ISSN 0741-3106, pages 716 - 718, XP011310646 [I] 1-4,7-13,16-20 * page 716 - page 718, column r, paragraph 2 * [A] 5,6,14,15 | [A] - David S Touretzky ET AL, "Neural Representation of Space in Rats and Robots", Computational Intelligence: Imitating Life. Proceedings of the symposium held at the 1994 IEEE World Congress on Computational Intelligence, (19940101), pages 57 - 68, URL: http://www.ri.cmu.edu/pub_files/pub2/touretzky_dave_1994_2/touretzky_dave_1994_2.pdf, (20150421), XP055184626 [A] 1-20 * page 1 - page 10, paragraph 4 * | [A] - LISAM GIOCOMO ET AL, "Computational Models of Grid Cells", NEURON, vol. 71, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.NEURON.2011.07.023, ISSN 0896-6273, (20110825), pages 589 - 603, (20110729), XP028271996 [A] 1-20 * page 589 - page 600, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neuron.2011.07.023 | [A] - T. HARTLEY ET AL, "Space in the brain: how the hippocampal formation supports spatial cognition", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (20131223), vol. 297, no. 5868, doi:10.1038/297681a0, ISSN 1476-4687, pages 1 - 18, XP055184662 [A] 1-20 * page 1 - page 13, column r, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1098/rstb.2012.0510 |