EP3113604 - TOBACCO INBRED AND HYBRID PLANTS AND TOBACCO PRODUCTS MADE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states North Carolina State University 1021 Main Campus Drive, 2nd Floor Raleigh NC 27606 / US | [2017/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEWIS, Ramsey S. 8640 Glade Hill Drive Apex, North Carolina 27539 / US | 02 /
DEWEY, Ralph E. 2403 Colony Woods Drive Apex, North Carolina 27523 / US | [2017/02] | Representative(s) | Kremer, Simon Mark Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/02] | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15710358.1 | 03.03.2015 | [2017/02] | WO2015US18393 | Priority number, date | US201461946993P | 03.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461946993 P | US201461947004P | 03.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461947004 P | US201461947013P | 03.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461947013 P | US201461978244P | 11.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461978244 P | US201461978246P | 11.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461978246 P | US201461978326P | 11.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461978326 P | [2017/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015134427 | Date: | 11.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3113604 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01H5/12, A24B15/10, C12N9/02, C12N9/10 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
A01H5/12 (EP,CN,US);
A24B13/00 (EP,CN,US);
A01H6/823 (EP,US);
A24B13/02 (EP,CN,US);
A24D1/00 (EP,CN,US);
A24D3/043 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] | Title | German: | INZUCHT- UND HYBRIDTABAKPFLANZEN UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE TABAKPRODUKTE | [2017/02] | English: | TOBACCO INBRED AND HYBRID PLANTS AND TOBACCO PRODUCTS MADE THEREOF | [2017/02] | French: | PLANTES HYBRIDES ET AUTOGAMES DE TABAC ET PRODUITS DE TABAC FABRIQUÉS À PARTIR DE CELLES-CI | [2017/02] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 13.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/42] | 31.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2011088180 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA STATE [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * page 46 - page 49; tables 2,3,4 *; | [XY]WO2012118779 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA STATE [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 39 - page 41; example 1 * * table 2 * [Y] 1-16; | [XP]WO2014110363 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA STATE [US]) [XP] 1-16* the whole document * | by applicant | US2006191548 | US2008245377 | - WEMSMAN; MATZINGER, TOB. SCI., (1968), vol. 12, pages 226 - 228 | - HECHT; HOFFMANN, CANCER SURVEYS, (1990), vol. 8, pages 273 - 294 | - HOFFMANN ET AL., J. TOXICOL. ENVIRON. HEALTH, (1994), vol. 41, pages 1 - 52 | - HECHT, CHEM. RES. TOXICOL., (1998), vol. 11, pages 559 - 603 | - BOYETTE; HAMM, REC. ADV. TOB. SCI., (2001), vol. 27, pages 17 - 22 | - BUSH ET AL., REC. ADV. TOB. SCI., (2001), vol. 27, pages 23 - 46 | - LEWIS ET AL., "Three nicotine demethylase genes mediate nornicotine biosynthesis in Nicotiana tabacum L.: Functional characterization of the CYP82E10 gene", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (2010), vol. 71, pages 1988 - 1998 | - "Tobacco", WERNSMAN, E.A.; RUFTY, R.C., Cultivar Development. Crop Species, MACMILLAN PUBLISHING GO., INC., (1987), pages 669 - 698 | - "Tobacco", WERNSMAN, E. A.; RUFTY, R. C., Cultivar Development. Crop Species, MACMILLAN PUBLISHING GO., INC., (1987), pages 669 - 698,761 | - LEWIS ET AL., PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (2010), vol. 71, pages 1988 - 1998 | - JACK ET AL., "Implications of reducing nornicotine accumulation in burley tobacco: appendix A - the LC protocol", REC. ADV. TOB. SCI., (2007), vol. 33, pages 58 - 79 | - LEWIS, PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (2010), vol. 71, pages 1988 - 1998 |