EP3105551 - DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE COMBUSTION OF A BURNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.I.B. Unigas S.p.A. Via Galvani 9 35011 Campodarsego (Padova) / IT | [2016/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANCOLINI, Riccardo Via Bellini 5 I-35010 Cadoneghe (Padova) / IT | [2016/51] | Representative(s) | Anselmi, Davide Bugnion S.p.A. Via Pancaldo, 68 37138 Verona / IT | [2016/51] | Application number, filing date | 15710908.3 | 11.02.2015 | [2016/51] | WO2015IB51015 | Priority number, date | IT2014VR00036 | 12.02.2014 Original published format: IT VR20140036 | [2016/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015121800 | Date: | 20.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3105551 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3105551 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/684, F23N1/02, F23N5/18, F23N5/24 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
F23N1/022 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
F23D14/36 (EP,IL);
F23D14/60 (EP,IL);
F23N1/102 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
F23N5/02 (EA,IL,US);
F23N5/18 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
F23N5/242 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
G01F1/6842 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
G01F5/00 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
F23N2225/06 (EP,EA,IL,US);
F23N2225/08 (EP,EA,IL,US);
F23N2225/26 (EP,EA,IL,US);
F23N2233/08 (EP,EA,IL,US);
F23N2237/00 (EA,IL,US);
F23N2241/02 (EA,IL,US);
F23N2241/04 (EA,IL,US);
F23N2241/06 (EA,IL,US);
F23N2241/18 (EA,IL,US);
F23N2900/00 (EA,IL,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/51] | Extension states | BA | 27.07.2016 | ME | 27.07.2016 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DER VERBRENNUNG EINES BRENNERS | [2016/51] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE COMBUSTION OF A BURNER | [2016/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR COMMANDER LA COMBUSTION D'UN BRÛLEUR | [2016/51] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/51] | 27.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19199543.0 / EP3608591 | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.10.2019 | CY | 30.10.2019 | CZ | 30.10.2019 | HR | 30.10.2019 | LT | 30.10.2019 | LV | 30.10.2019 | MC | 30.10.2019 | MK | 30.10.2019 | MT | 30.10.2019 | SI | 30.10.2019 | SK | 30.10.2019 | SM | 30.10.2019 | LU | 11.02.2020 | IS | 29.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
MT | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
LU | 11.02.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
LU | 11.02.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
LU | 11.02.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | HR | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | LT | 30.10.2019 | |
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | LT | 30.10.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4138725 (IKEMOTO ZENICHI, et al) [Y] 1-6,12-17,19-23,26,32 * column 7, line 49 - column 8, line 36; figures 1, 5 *; | [A]JPS58148314 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 24 * abstract *; | [A]US4498863 (HANSON ROBERT C [US], et al) [A] 7 * column 2, lines 50-54; figure 1 *; | [A]US4576570 (ADAMS JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1,15,32 * column 7, line 33 - column 9, line 62; figure 1 *; | [A]US4585161 (KUSAMA AKIO [JP], et al) [A] 11,18 * column 2, lines 58, 59 * * page 3, lines 25, 26; figure 1 *; | [A]JPS6484021 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,32 * abstract *; | [A]WO9614548 (ASTEC IND [US]) [A] 8-10 * page 11, lines 18-31 * * page 14, lines 15-25; figure 9 *; | [A]JPH08313318 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,32* abstract *; | [Y]US6018994 (YONEZAWA FUMIYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6,12-17,19-23,26,32 * column 6, lines 12-25; figures 5, 13 *; | [A]DE10348324 (GVP GES ZUR VERMARKTUNG DER PO [DE]) [A] 1,15,32 * paragraphs [0030] , [0033] , [0034] , [0035] *; | [A]US2013045077 (METZ TOBIAS [DE], et al) [A] 1,32 * paragraphs [0029] , [0030]; figures 2,3 * | Examination | US4004730 |