EP3123208 - DETECTION OF ITEMS IN A CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/05] | DETECTION OF ITEMS IN AN OBJECT | ||
[2020/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smiths Heimann GmbH Im Herzen 4 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEILMANN, Geert Klingenbachstr. 22 65207 Wiesbaden / DE | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2020/38] |
Former [2017/05] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15711548.6 | 24.03.2015 | [2017/05] | WO2015EP56259 | Priority number, date | DE201410205447 | 24.03.2014 Original published format: DE102014205447 | [2017/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015144706 | Date: | 01.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3123208 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3123208 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01V5/00, G06T7/00 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
G06T7/0004 (EP,CN,US);
G06V10/443 (EP,CN,US);
G01N23/04 (EP,US);
G01V5/224 (EP,CN,US);
G06T7/12 (EP,US);
G06T7/68 (EP,US);
G06V10/42 (EP,CN,US);
G01N2223/206 (US);
G01N2223/401 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DETEKTION VON GEGENSTÄNDEN IN EINEM OBJEKT | [2017/05] | English: | DETECTION OF ITEMS IN A CONTAINER | [2020/16] | French: | DETECTION DES OBJETS DANS UN RECIPIENT | [2020/16] |
Former [2017/05] | DETECTION OF ITEMS IN AN OBJECT | ||
Former [2017/05] | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'UN OBJET | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 07.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2015 | AL | 16.09.2020 | CY | 16.09.2020 | CZ | 16.09.2020 | DK | 16.09.2020 | EE | 16.09.2020 | ES | 16.09.2020 | FI | 16.09.2020 | HR | 16.09.2020 | IT | 16.09.2020 | LT | 16.09.2020 | LV | 16.09.2020 | MC | 16.09.2020 | MK | 16.09.2020 | MT | 16.09.2020 | NL | 16.09.2020 | PL | 16.09.2020 | RO | 16.09.2020 | RS | 16.09.2020 | SE | 16.09.2020 | SI | 16.09.2020 | SK | 16.09.2020 | SM | 16.09.2020 | TR | 16.09.2020 | BG | 16.12.2020 | NO | 16.12.2020 | GR | 17.12.2020 | IS | 16.01.2021 | PT | 18.01.2021 | AT | 24.03.2021 | IE | 24.03.2021 | LU | 24.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 24.03.2015 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
MK | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
TR | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 24.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 24.03.2015 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
MK | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 24.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 24.03.2015 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 24.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 24.03.2015 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 24.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 24.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 24.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 24.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 16.09.2020 | |
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 16.09.2020 | |
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
NO | 16.12.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6711293 (LOWE DAVID G [CA]) [Y] 2 * abstract * * column 7, line 53 - column 8, line 65 *; | [YA]EP1522878 (YXLON INT SECURITY GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2-10,13,15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0007] , [0008] , [0010]; figure 6 * [A] 1,11,12,14; | [A]WO2008149357 (SIEMENS COMP AIDED DIAGNOSIS L [IL], et al) [A] 1,14 * page 2, lines 1-14,30-33 - page 3, lines 16-24; figure 1 ** page 4, lines 1-4 *; | [Y]US2011222779 (KARANAM GOPAL [IN], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0010] - [0012] - [0051] , [0054] , [0060] , [0061]; figures 7,20 *; | [Y]EP2375375 (ANMO ELECTRONICS CORP [TW]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0057] - [0064]; figure 9 *; | [Y]EP2696196 (OPTOSECURITY INC [CA]) [Y] 4,9,10 * paragraphs [0041] , [0077] , [0078]; figures 1,2,5a,b *; | [Y] - WAI HO LI ET AL, "Real Time Detection and Segmentation of Reflectionally Symmetric Objects in Digital Images", INTELLIGENT ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS, 2006 IEEE/RSJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PI, (20061001), ISBN 978-1-4244-0258-8, pages 4867 - 4873, XP031006900 [Y] 1-15 * page 4867, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 4868, column 1, paragraphs 3,4; figures 1,2,3c,7 * * page 4870, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 4870, column 2, paragraphs 1,2 * |