EP3116976 - INTERNAL LINING FOR DELAYED COKER DRUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900 Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US | [2020/23] |
Former [2017/03] | For all designated states Exxonmobil Research And Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900 Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HINSON, Christopher, S. 29 Sincoe Rise SW Calgary, AB T3H 4N2 / CA | 02 /
FOWLER, Christopher, John 8406 Gentlewood Court Houston, TX 77095 / US | 03 /
SINCLAIR, David, Scott 1606 Hillendahl Boulevard Houston, TX 77055 / US | 04 /
SUSONG, Adam, Garrett 3337 Lockshire Ridge Ct. Spring, TX 77386 / US | 05 /
ANTRAM, Robert, Lee 7343 Windsor Court Warrenton, VA 20186 / US | 06 /
PETERSON, John, Roger 43683 Frost Court Ashburn, VA 20147 / US | [2017/13] |
Former [2017/03] | 01 /
HINSON, Christopher, S. 29 Sincoe Rise SW Calgary, AB T3H 4N2 / CA | ||
02 /
FOWLER, Christopher, John 8406 Gentlewood Court Houston, TX 77095 / US | |||
03 /
SINCLAIR, David, Scott 1606 Hillendahl Boulevard Houston, TX 77055 / US | |||
04 /
SUSONG, Adam, Garrett 1711 18th Street NW Apt. 32 Washington, DC 20009 / US | |||
05 /
ANTRAM, Robert, Lee 7343 Windsor Court Warrenton, VA 20186 / US | |||
06 /
PETERSON, John, Roger 43683 Frost Court Ashburn, VA 20147 / US | Representative(s) | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe LLC IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/03] | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 15711623.7 | 11.03.2015 | [2017/03] | WO2015US19832 | Priority number, date | US201461951614P | 12.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461951614 P | US201461992316P | 13.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461992316 P | US201514641903 | 09.03.2015 Original published format: US201514641903 | [2017/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015138534 | Date: | 17.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3116976 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3116976 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C10B1/04, C10B55/00, F27D1/10, F27D1/14 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
C10G9/18 (EP,US);
C10B1/04 (EP,RU,US);
C10B39/06 (US);
C10B43/14 (US);
C10B55/00 (EP,US);
C10B57/045 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INNENAUSKLEIDUNG FÜR EINE DELAYED-COKER-TROMMEL | [2017/03] | English: | INTERNAL LINING FOR DELAYED COKER DRUM | [2017/03] | French: | REVÊTEMENT INTERNE DE TAMBOUR D'UNITÉ DE COKÉFACTION DIFFÉRÉE | [2017/03] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/03] | 12.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2015 | AL | 04.11.2020 | AT | 04.11.2020 | CY | 04.11.2020 | CZ | 04.11.2020 | DK | 04.11.2020 | EE | 04.11.2020 | ES | 04.11.2020 | FI | 04.11.2020 | HR | 04.11.2020 | IT | 04.11.2020 | LT | 04.11.2020 | LV | 04.11.2020 | MC | 04.11.2020 | MK | 04.11.2020 | NL | 04.11.2020 | PL | 04.11.2020 | RO | 04.11.2020 | RS | 04.11.2020 | SE | 04.11.2020 | SI | 04.11.2020 | SK | 04.11.2020 | SM | 04.11.2020 | BG | 04.02.2021 | NO | 04.02.2021 | GR | 05.02.2021 | IS | 04.03.2021 | PT | 04.03.2021 | IE | 11.03.2021 | LU | 11.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | FR | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 11.03.2015 | |
AL | 04.11.2020 | ||
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CY | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 11.03.2015 | |
AL | 04.11.2020 | ||
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 04.11.2020 | |
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 04.11.2020 | |
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 04.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1823451 (HENCKEN JOHN K); | [XYI]US2702269 (JULIUS GELLER); | [Y]US2008003125 (PETERSON JOHN R [US], et al); |